United Services Automobile Association et al v. Solheim et al
Plaintiff: United Services Automobile Association Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association General Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association and Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Eric A Solheim, Lightning Capital LLC, Ready Glass LLC, A&E Solheim LLC, Ready Glass LLC doing business as A&E Auto Glass and A&E Solheim LLC doing business as A&E Auto Glass
Case Number: 2:2019cv05570
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine
Referring Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. #27 ), Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
February 28, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United Services Automobile Association, United Services Automobile Association Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilde, Nishan)
February 27, 2020 Filing 26 STATUS REPORT Regarding Settlement by United Services Automobile Association, United Services Automobile Association Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association General Indemnity Company. (Wilde, Nishan)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re: #24 Notice of Dismissal: IT IS ORDERED that Defendants Eric A. Solheim, A&E Solheim, LLC d/b/a A&E Auto Glass, and Ready Glass, LLC d/b/a A&E Auto Glass are dismissed, with prejudice, all parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Because the Notice does not indicate the dismissal of Defendant Lighting Capital, LLC, the Clerk of Court shall not close this case. The Court affirms the deadline for filing a Joint Status Report of 2/27/2020 (Doc. #23 ). Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 1/30/2020. (RMW)
January 30, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, United Services Automobile Association Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association General Indemnity Company. Party Eric A Solheim, A&E Solheim LLC and Ready Glass LLC terminated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilde, Nishan)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re: #22 Notice of Settlement: IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than 2/27/2020, addressing whether the settlement has been finalized and whether dismissal of the case with prejudice is appropriate at that time. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 1/6/2020. (RMW)
January 3, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Settlement by United Services Automobile Association, United Services Automobile Association Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilde, Nishan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Nishan Joseph Wilde. (Wilde, Nishan)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 1/3/2020 for Defendants Eric A. Solheim, A & E Solheim, LLC d/b/a A & E Auto Glass, and Ready Glass, LLC, and until 1/17/2020 for defendant Lightning Capital, to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 12/5/2019. (MMO)
December 4, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint and Acknowledging Service by Lightning Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Acceptance of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order - Order Regarding Stipulation Acknowledging Service and to Extend Time for Defendant Lightning Capital, L.L.C. to Respond to Complaint)(Johnson, Paul)
December 4, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lightning Capital LLC. (Johnson, Paul)
December 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul G Johnson on behalf of Lightning Capital LLC. (Johnson, Paul)
December 4, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by A&E Solheim LLC, Ready Glass LLC, Eric A Solheim. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ricciardi, Alfred)
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Michael T Liburdi. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-5570-PHX-MTL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 20, 2019 Filing 14 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, United Services Automobile Association Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association General Indemnity Company. (Popham, Gary)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, United Services Automobile Association Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association General Indemnity Company: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Initial Pleadings upon A&E Solheim, LLC dba A&E Auto Glass on November 14, 2019. (Popham, Gary)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, United Services Automobile Association Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association General Indemnity Company: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Initial Pleadings upon Ready Glass, LLC dba A&E Auto Glass on November 14, 2019. (Popham, Gary)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, United Services Automobile Association Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association General Indemnity Company: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Initial Pleadings upon Eric Solheim on November 14, 2019. (Popham, Gary)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to A&E Solheim LLC, Lightning Capital LLC, Ready Glass LLC, Eric A Solheim. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, United Services Automobile Association Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association General Indemnity Company. (Popham, Gary)
November 8, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Dennis Bruce Kass and Ellen Burach-Zion on behalf of Plaintiffs Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, United Services Automobile Association Casualty Insurance Company, and United Services Automobile Association General Indemnity Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by United Services Automobile Association, United Services Automobile Association General Indemnity Company, Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association Casualty Insurance Company. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAR)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to All Plaintiffs. (BAR)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by United Services Automobile Association, United Services Automobile Association General Indemnity Company, Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association Casualty Insurance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAR)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAR)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17606035. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 19-05570-PXH-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (BAR)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17606035 filed by United Services Automobile Association, Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association General Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association Casualty Insurance Company. (Popham, Gary) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Cont. Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Services Automobile Association et al v. Solheim et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Services Automobile Association Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary Lee Popham, Jr.
Represented By: Ellen Burach-Zion
Represented By: Dennis Bruce Kass
Represented By: Nishan Joseph Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Services Automobile Association General Indemnity Company
Represented By: Gary Lee Popham, Jr.
Represented By: Ellen Burach-Zion
Represented By: Dennis Bruce Kass
Represented By: Nishan Joseph Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Services Automobile Association
Represented By: Gary Lee Popham, Jr.
Represented By: Ellen Burach-Zion
Represented By: Dennis Bruce Kass
Represented By: Nishan Joseph Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary Lee Popham, Jr.
Represented By: Ellen Burach-Zion
Represented By: Dennis Bruce Kass
Represented By: Nishan Joseph Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric A Solheim
Represented By: Alfred W Ricciardi
Represented By: Philip R Rupprecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lightning Capital LLC
Represented By: John James Egbert
Represented By: Paul G Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ready Glass LLC
Represented By: Alfred W Ricciardi
Represented By: Philip R Rupprecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&E Solheim LLC
Represented By: Alfred W Ricciardi
Represented By: Philip R Rupprecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ready Glass LLC doing business as A&E Auto Glass
Represented By: Alfred W Ricciardi
Represented By: Philip R Rupprecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&E Solheim LLC doing business as A&E Auto Glass
Represented By: Alfred W Ricciardi
Represented By: Philip R Rupprecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?