Campo et al v. Milbank Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Maria Campos, Juan Campos, Juan Campo and Maria Campo
Defendant: State Automobile Insurance Company and Milbank Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv05582
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Anthony Rossi on behalf of Milbank Insurance Company. (Rossi, Michael)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE for 1/22/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 401, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Neil V Wake. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 11/18/2019. (RMV)
November 18, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Milbank Insurance Company.(Hensley, Michael)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 11/14/19. (SLQ)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the parties' Stipulation (Doc. #10 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendant Milbank Insurance Company shall have until Wednesday, November 27, 2019 to file its responsive pleading to the Plaintiffs' Complaint. No further extension will be granted. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 11/14/2019. (SST)
November 14, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Neil V Wake. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-5582-PHX-NVW. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Milbank Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hensley, Michael)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Juan Campos, Maria Campos. (Kanouse, Colby)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Milbank Insurance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17612386. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5582-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (MCO)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Milbank Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent State Auto Financial Group for Milbank Insurance Company. (Hensley, Michael) (MCO)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV 2019 013560. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17612386 filed by Milbank Insurance Company. (Hensley, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campo et al v. Milbank Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Campos
Represented By: Colby Ryan Kanouse
Represented By: Charles Paul Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Campos
Represented By: Colby Ryan Kanouse
Represented By: Charles Paul Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Campo
Represented By: Colby Ryan Kanouse
Represented By: Charles Paul Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Campo
Represented By: Colby Ryan Kanouse
Represented By: Charles Paul Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milbank Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael E Hensley
Represented By: Michael Anthony Rossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?