Lembo v. UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Robin Lembo
Defendant: Group Plan for Employees of Southwestern Eye Center and UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv05619
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Robin Lembo. Party Group Plan for Employees of Southwestern Eye Center terminated. (Counters, Lisa)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Robin Lembo: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 11/25/2019 to UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company . (Counters, Lisa)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company. (Hanus, David)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Hanus on behalf of UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company. (Hanus, David)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 11/14/2019. (TCA)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on February 11, 2020. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 11/14/2019. (TCA)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company and Group Plan for Employees of Southwestern Eye Center. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17628789. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5619-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Robin Lembo. (Counters, Lisa) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MYE)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17628789 filed by Robin Lembo. (Counters, Lisa) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lembo v. UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Plan for Employees of Southwestern Eye Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company
Represented By: David J Hanus
Represented By: Stephen William Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Lembo
Represented By: Lisa Jeanette Counters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?