Pinnacle West Capital Corporation et al v. Abeyta et al
Plaintiff: Pinnacle West Capital Corporation and Pinnacle West Capital Corporation Group Life & Medical Plan
Defendant: Bauman & Dow PC and Christopher L Abeyta
Case Number: 2:2019cv05651
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. #9 ), Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Pinnacle West Capital Corporation, Pinnacle West Capital Corporation Group Life & Medical Plan. (West, John)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE re: Service by Pinnacle West Capital Corporation, Pinnacle West Capital Corporation Group Life & Medical Plan re: #6 Order, Set Deadlines . (West, John)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pinnacle West Capital Corporation. (West, John) *Modified to correct filer on 12/5/2019 (REK).
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant (s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on February 19, 2020, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/21/19. (MAW)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Pinnacle West Capital Corporation, Pinnacle West Capital Corporation Group Life & Medical Plan. (BAC)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Christopher L Abeyta, Bauman & Dow PC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17650530. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-05651-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Pinnacle West Capital Corporation, Pinnacle West Capital Corporation Group Life & Medical Plan. (West, John) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAC)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-17650530 filed by Pinnacle West Capital Corporation, Pinnacle West Capital Corporation Group Life & Medical Plan. (West, John) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinnacle West Capital Corporation et al v. Abeyta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinnacle West Capital Corporation
Represented By: John C West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinnacle West Capital Corporation Group Life & Medical Plan
Represented By: John C West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bauman & Dow PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher L Abeyta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?