Collen et al v. UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Jerry T Collen and Elizabeth Collen
Defendant: Unknown Parties, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated and UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv05692
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Elizabeth Collen, Jerry T Collen. (Sullivan, Robert)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Stipulation for Additional Time to File response to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. The deadline for Plaintiffs Jerry T. Collen and Elizabeth Collen to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Doc. #9 ) is extended to 1/24/2020. There will be no further extensions absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 1/13/2020. (RMW)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 *STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Response to #9 Motion to Dismiss by Elizabeth Collen, Jerry T Collen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Robert) *Modified to correct event and add document linkage on 1/13/2020. Document is not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3). Attorney noticed on 1/13/2020 (RMV).
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(West, John)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #7 Amended Complaint filed by Jerry T Collen, Elizabeth Collen. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMP)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jerry T Collen, Elizabeth Collen.(Sullivan, Robert)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Stipulation For Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. UnitedHealth Group Incorporated and UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company answer due 12/13/2019. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 12/4/2019. (MMO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(West, John)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17677579. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5692-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
November 26, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Demand for Jury Trial, Notice of Service of Offer of Judgment upon UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company on 10/31/2019. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 11/4/2019) (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (West, John) (ARC)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company. (West, John) (ARC)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-014237. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17677579 filed by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company. (West, John) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-F)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collen et al v. UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Bauman
Represented By: John C West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Bauman
Represented By: John C West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry T Collen
Represented By: Robert Thomas Aquinas Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Collen
Represented By: Robert Thomas Aquinas Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?