Rigsby et al v. GoDaddy Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Scott Rigsby Foundation Incorporated and Scott Rigsby
Defendant: Go Daddy Operating Company LLC, GoDaddy Incorporated, Desert Newco LLC and GoDaddy.com LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv05710
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Declaratory Judgment and Motion for Summary Judgment by Desert Newco LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company LLC, GoDaddy Incorporated, GoDaddy.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Zecchini, Paula)
December 2, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE re: Appearance by Desert Newco LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company LLC, GoDaddy Incorporated, GoDaddy.com LLC . (Zecchini, Paula)
December 2, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MAP)
December 2, 2019 Filing 41 Letter Regarding Transfer of 1:19-cv-3824-JPB from the Northern District of Georgia. New Case Number: CV-19-5710-PHX-MTL. (MAP)
December 2, 2019 Filing 40 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-03824 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
November 25, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (ddm) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #20 Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue and transferring this action to the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 11/25/19. (ddm) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
November 24, 2019 Filing 38 First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Count Three for DJ by The Scott Rigsby Foundation, Inc.. (Dalziel, Charles) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
November 23, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE re #36 MOTION to Stay of Briefing Schedule Deny same Grant Extension through December 9 filed by The Scott Rigsby Foundation, Inc.. (Dalziel, Charles) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Stay of Briefing Schedule with Brief In Support by Desert Newco, LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Monhait, Jeffrey) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply with Brief In Support by Desert Newco, LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Monhait, Jeffrey) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
November 20, 2019 Submission of #27 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Under GA UDPTA, #28 Emergency MOTION for Hearing, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ddm) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY BRIEF re #27 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Under GA UDPTA filed by Scott Rigsby. (Dalziel, Charles) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 33 First MOTION Declaratory Judgment Contract Unenforceable by The Scott Rigsby Foundation, Inc.. (Dalziel, Charles) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
November 5, 2019 Submission of #20 MOTION to Transfer Venue or, in the alternative, MOTION to Dismiss, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ddm) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 Emergency MOTION for Hearing re #27 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Under GA UDPTA expedited filed by Desert Newco, LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Moss, Alycen) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Under GA UDPTA filed by Desert Newco, LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Jessica Hanyen in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit to Supplemental Declaration of Jessica Hanyen in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction)(Moss, Alycen) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY BRIEF re #20 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Desert Newco, LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Moss, Alycen) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE by The Scott Rigsby Foundation, Inc. of counsel scheduling conflict Nov 4-6 (Dalziel, Charles) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court DIRECTS Defendants to file a Response to Plaintiffs' #27 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Monday, November 4, 2019. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/29/19. (bnw) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 28 Emergency MOTION for Hearing re #27 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Under GA UDPTA expedited by The Scott Rigsby Foundation, Inc.. (Dalziel, Charles) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 27 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Under GA UDPTA by The Scott Rigsby Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hanyen Profile statutes)(Dalziel, Charles) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE re #20 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case filed preliminary to Motion for declaratory judgment filed by Scott Rigsby. (Dalziel, Charles) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #23 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/21/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
October 21, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #23 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey M. Monhait Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9005562). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Jeffrey Monhait added appearing on behalf of Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC (cdg) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 the parties' Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defense Motions. Plaintiffs shall have through and including October 19, 2019, to file their response to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue or, in the alternative, Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/18/19. (ddm) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 24 First MOTION for Extension of Time respond to defense motions re: #20 MOTION to Dismiss and Transfer by Scott Rigsby. (Dalziel, Charles) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey M. Monhait Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9005562). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Desert Newco, LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Courts Admitted)(Moss, Alycen) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Alycen A. Moss on behalf of Desert Newco, LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC (Moss, Alycen) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
October 7, 2019 RETURN of #19 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey M. Monhait Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8974508). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: local counsel. (pmb) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Desert Newco, LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Kohlberg Kravis Roberts & Co. L.P. for Desert Newco, LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC by Desert Newco, LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC.(Espy-Williams, Lynnette) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Transfer Venue or, in the alternative, MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Desert Newco, LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Jessica Hanyen in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss, #3 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Espy-Williams, Lynnette) . Added MOTION to Transfer Case on 10/17/2019 (ddm). [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey M. Monhait Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8974508). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Desert Newco, LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A (List of Courts to which Petitioner Jeffrey Monhait is admitted))(Espy-Williams, Lynnette) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting the #17 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time, through October 2, 2019, for Defendants to respond to #1 Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/19/19. (ddm) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Desert Newco, LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint)(Espy-Williams, Lynnette) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynnette D. Espy-Williams on behalf of Desert Newco, LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC (Espy-Williams, Lynnette) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/12/19. (bnw) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (ddm) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED AO 120 Plaintiffs. (Dalziel, Charles) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
August 31, 2019 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Scott Rigsby. GoDaddy.com, LLC served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (Dalziel, Charles) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Scott Rigsby. Desert Newco, LLC served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Dalziel, Charles) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Scott Rigsby. Go Daddy Operating Company served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Dalziel, Charles) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Scott Rigsby. GoDaddy Inc. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Dalziel, Charles) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Scott Rigsby Civil Cover Sheet (Dalziel, Charles) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(ddm) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Scott Rigsby GoDaddy.com, LLC (Dalziel, Charles) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Scott Rigsby Desert Newco, LLC (Dalziel, Charles) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Scott Rigsby GoDaddy Operating Company, LLC (Dalziel, Charles) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Scott Rigsby GoDaddy.com, LLC (Dalziel, Charles) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Scott Rigsby GoDaddy Inc. (Dalziel, Charles) [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]
August 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Scott Rigsby and The Scott Rigsby Foundation, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8887587) (eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 12/2/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rigsby et al v. GoDaddy Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Go Daddy Operating Company LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey M Monhait
Represented By: Paula L Zecchini
Represented By: Alycen A Moss
Represented By: Lynnette D Espy-Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoDaddy Incorporated
Represented By: Jeffrey M Monhait
Represented By: Paula L Zecchini
Represented By: Alycen A Moss
Represented By: Lynnette D Espy-Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Newco LLC
Represented By: Paula L Zecchini
Represented By: Alycen A Moss
Represented By: Lynnette D Espy-Williams
Represented By: Jeffrey M Monhait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoDaddy.com LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey M Monhait
Represented By: Paula L Zecchini
Represented By: Alycen A Moss
Represented By: Lynnette D Espy-Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Rigsby Foundation Incorporated
Represented By: Charles M Dalziel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Rigsby
Represented By: Charles M Dalziel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?