Garcia et al v. Mine Safety Appliances Company et al
Plaintiff: Adalberto Murillo Garcia and Aracely Vasquez Rivera
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Unknown Parties, Mine Safety Appliances Company and W.W. Grainger Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv05789
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC. (Auther, William)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 10/2/2020. Dispositive motions due by 5/7/2021. Telephone Conference set for 5/21/2021 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. Scheduling conference set for 1/30/2020 is vacated. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 1/29/2020. (TCA)
January 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #12 Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a) - Forms of Papers. Please note for future filings; information that must be stated upon the first page of every document and may be presented for filing. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
January 22, 2020 Filing 12 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Joint Case Management Report filed by Plaintiff Adalberto Murillo Garcia. (Popilock, John)
January 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #9 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
January 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants Mine Safety Appliances Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC. (Auther, William)
January 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiffs Adalberto Murillo Garcia, Aracely Vasquez Rivera. (Popilock, John)
January 6, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for John Michael Popilock on behalf of Plaintiffs Adalberto Murillo Garcia and Aracely Vasquez Rivera. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mine Safety Appliances Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Incorporated as to Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC . (Auther, William) *Modified info on 12/26/2019 (DXD).
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY, LLC'S SEPARATE ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC.(Auther, William)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/30/2020 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 12/16/2019. (TCA)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 12/16/2019. (TCA)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Mine Safety Appliances Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC. (BAC)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17722990. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-05789-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
December 10, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Arbitration upon WW Grainger Incorporated on 11/18/19(original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 11/20/19); and Mine Safety Appliances Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC on 11/21/19 (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 11/20/19).(BAC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-010152. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-17722990 filed by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company. (Auther, William) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-I)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia et al v. Mine Safety Appliances Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC
Represented By: William Francis Auther
Represented By: Charles Michael Seby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company
Represented By: William Francis Auther
Represented By: Charles Michael Seby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.W. Grainger Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adalberto Murillo Garcia
Represented By: Jason Adam Harris
Represented By: John Michael Popilock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aracely Vasquez Rivera
Represented By: Jason Adam Harris
Represented By: John Michael Popilock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?