Armstrong et al v. Ulrich
Not Classified By Court: Franklin American Mortgage Company
Appellant: Lindsey Dawn Armstrong and Jason Michael Armstrong
Appellee: Dale D Ulrich
Case Number: 2:2019cv05802
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (text only): The Court having received the Memo from the Bankruptcy Court (Doc. 5), IT IS ORDERED that if Appellant does not take all necessary steps to have a Certificate of Record issued by 2/24/2020, this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. See Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Opening Brief (Doc. #3 ) is stricken. The Opening Brief must be re-filed on a full record, within the deadlines set by this Court's scheduling order, which will issue after a Certificate of Record has been received. Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 1/28/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE from the Bankruptcy Court that the certificate that the Record on Appeal is complete cannot be filed for the reason(s) stated in the attached document. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #3 Brief - Bankruptcy Opening filed by Lindsey Dawn Armstrong, Jason Michael Armstrong. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by attorney Chris Dutkiewicz but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Kenneth Neeley. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMP)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 STRICKEN by Doc. 6 - OPENING BRIEF by Jason Michael Armstrong, Lindsey Dawn Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpt of Record)(Neeley, Kenneth) Modified on 1/28/2020 (RMW).
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (REK)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court (Bankruptcy Appellate Panel File) by Jason Michael Armstrong, Lindsey Dawn Armstrong. (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong et al v. Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Franklin American Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Lindsey Dawn Armstrong
Represented By: Dane Christian Paulsen
Represented By: Christopher James Dutkiewicz
Represented By: Kenneth Lynn Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jason Michael Armstrong
Represented By: Dane Christian Paulsen
Represented By: Christopher James Dutkiewicz
Represented By: Kenneth Lynn Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dale D Ulrich
Represented By: Terry A Dake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?