County Mutual Insurance Company v. Wespac Construction Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: County Mutual Insurance Company and County Mutual Insurance Company successor in interest Middlesex Mutual Assurance Company other Scottsdale MAR LLC doing business as Las Aquas of Scottsdale Apartments
Defendant: AZ Fire Sprinklers LLC and Wespac Construction Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv05841
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 20 *MOTION to Amend/Correct #15 Amended Complaint by County Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Urman, Gary) *Modified to correct event on 2/12/2020 (GMP).
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court will issue a scheduling order after receiving the parties' Rule 26(f) report. After reviewing the Rule 26(f) report, the Court will set a case management conference if meeting with the parties appears necessary or helpful. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED as follows: The parties are directed to meet, confer, and develop a Rule 26 (f) Joint Case Management Report, which must be filed no later than February 26, 2020 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 1/29/20. (MAW)
January 24, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AZ Fire Sprinklers LLC. (Samuels, Douglas)
January 24, 2020 Filing 17 AZ Fire Sprinkler, LLC's ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by AZ Fire Sprinklers LLC.(Samuels, Douglas)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on March 17, 2020, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; 3. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file with the Clerk of Court a notice of service of MIDP Responses, supplemental MIDP Responses, and production of ESI, rather than copies of the actual disclosures [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 1/7/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
January 6, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Complaint) against All Defendants filed by County Mutual Insurance Company.(Urman, Gary)
January 6, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by County Mutual Insurance Company (Second Amended Complaint). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Urman, Gary)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that by January 17, 2020, Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint properly alleging the citizenship of AZ Fire Sprinklers, LLC. If Plaintiff fails to timely file a second amended complaint, the clerk of the court shall dismiss this case, without prejudice, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 1/2/2020. (TCA)
December 31, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by County Mutual Insurance Company.(Urman, Gary)
December 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by County Mutual Insurance Company . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Urman, Gary)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that by January 10, 2020, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint properly alleging the citizenship of AZ Fire Sprinklers, LLC. Plaintiff fails to timely file an amended complaint, the clerk of the court shall dismiss this case, without prejudice, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction.Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 12/30/2019. (TCA)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint by Plaintiff County Mutual Insurance Company. (Urman, Gary)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to AZ Fire Sprinklers LLC, Wespac Construction Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by County Mutual Insurance Company. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the AUTOMATED CIVIL COVER SHEET when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17748730. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5841-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by County Mutual Insurance Company. (Urman, Gary) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MCO)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by County Mutual Insurance Company. (Urman, Gary) (MCO)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17748730 filed by County Mutual Insurance Company. (Urman, Gary) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County Mutual Insurance Company v. Wespac Construction Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary Frank Urman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County Mutual Insurance Company successor in interest Middlesex Mutual Assurance Company other Scottsdale MAR LLC doing business as Las Aquas of Scottsdale Apartments
Represented By: Gary Frank Urman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AZ Fire Sprinklers LLC
Represented By: Douglas Justin Samuels
Represented By: Jodi Lee Mullis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wespac Construction Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?