Myohanen v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Cherie Myohanen
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv05866
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Cherie Myohanen: Proof of Service re: Complaint upon The United States of America c/o Office of the U.S. Attorney, District of Arizona on 1/2/2020. (Taber, J)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to United States of America c/o U.S. Attorney, District of Arizona. (HLA)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Submitted by Cherie Myohanen. (Taber, J)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - The Clerk shall terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 3/23/20. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 12/23/19. (DXD)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Motions to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 12/23/19. (DXD)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Cherie Myohanen. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MYE)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17759093. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5866-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Cherie Myohanen. (Taber, J) (MYE)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17759093 filed by Cherie Myohanen. (Taber, J) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myohanen v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherie Myohanen
Represented By: Austin Kipling Kurtz
Represented By: J Tyrrell Taber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?