Takieh v. Banner Health et al
Plaintiff: Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh
Defendant: Unknown O'Connor, Rebecca Ailes-Fine, Michael O'Connor, Banner Health, Stephen Hu, Unknown Maxfield, Christopher Volk, Unknown Lyons, Steven Maxfield, Unknown Hu, Peter Fine, Michael O'Meara, James Lyons, Unknown O'Meara, Dean M Dinner, Unknown Volk and Janice Cohen Dinner
Case Number: 2:2019cv05878
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall Papetti on behalf of Stephen Hu, Unknown Hu, James Lyons, Unknown Lyons, Steven Maxfield, Unknown Maxfield, Michael O'Meara, Unknown O'Meara. (Papetti, Randall)
February 14, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss Case DEFENDANTS MICHAEL AND JANE DOE O'MEARA, STEPHEN AND JANE DOE HU, STEVEN AND JANE DOE MAXFIELD, AND JAMES AND JANE DOE LYONS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Stephen Hu, Unknown Hu, James Lyons, Unknown Lyons, Steven Maxfield, Unknown Maxfield, Michael O'Meara, Unknown O'Meara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through G)(Sutton, Jared)
February 14, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Rebecca Ailes-Fine, Dean M Dinner, Janice Cohen Dinner, Peter Fine, Michael O'Connor, Christopher Volk. (Beauchamp, Keith)
February 14, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Rebecca Ailes-Fine, Banner Health, Dean M Dinner, Janice Cohen Dinner, Peter Fine, Michael O'Connor, Christopher Volk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7)(Beauchamp, Keith)
January 30, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #32 Service Executed filed by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh, #33 Service Executed filed by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
January 29, 2020 Filing 33 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh: Acceptance of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Banner Health; Janice Cohen Dinner, and Dean M. Dinner; Michael O'Connor, M.D., and Jane Doe O'Connor; Peter Fine and Rebecca Ailes-Fine; Christopher Volk and Jane Doe Volk on January 29, 2020. (Smith, Stephen)
January 29, 2020 Filing 32 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh: Acceptance of Service re: Acceptance of Service upon Michael O'Meara, M.D. and Jane Doe O'Meara; Steven Hu, M.D. and Jane Doe Hu; Steven Maxfield, M.D. and Jane Doe Maxfield; and, James Lyons, M.D. and Jane Doe Lyons on January 26, 2020. (Smith, Stephen)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #26 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. The deadline for all existing Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 2/14/2020. There will be no further extensions absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 1/23/2020. (RMW)
January 9, 2020 Filing 30 Summons Issued as to Stephen Hu. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 8, 2020 Filing 29 SUMMONS Submitted by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. (Smith, Stephen)
January 8, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #14 Summons Submitted filed by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. Defendant name does not match complaint. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 8, 2020 Filing 27 Summons Issued as to Rebecca Ailes-Fine, Banner Health, Dean M Dinner, Janice Cohen Dinner, Peter Fine, Unknown Hu, James Lyons, Unknown Lyons, Steven Maxfield, Unknown Maxfield, Michael O'Connor, Unknown O'Connor, Michael O'Meara, Unknown O'Meara, Christopher Volk, Unknown Volk. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 7, 2020 Filing 26 *STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Rebecca Ailes-Fine, Banner Health, Janice Cohen Dinner, Peter Fine, Michael O'Connor, Christopher Volk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beauchamp, Keith) *Modified to remove filer on 1/8/2020 (RMV).
January 7, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS Submitted by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. (Smith, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Submitted by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. (Smith, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Submitted by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. (Smith, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Submitted by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. (Smith, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Submitted by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. (Smith, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Submitted by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. (Smith, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Submitted by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. (Smith, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Submitted by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. (Smith, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Submitted by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. (Smith, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Submitted by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. (Smith, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Submitted by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. (Smith, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Submitted by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. (Smith, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Submitted by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. (Smith, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Submitted by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. (Smith, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Submitted by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. (Smith, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Submitted by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. (Smith, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Submitted by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. (Smith, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Submitted by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. (Smith, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. (Smith, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. (Smith, Stephen)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint, 4 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. (Smith, Stephen)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17764963. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T. Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5878-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17764963 filed by Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh. (Smith, Stephen for Miller, William) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Takieh v. Banner Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Ailes-Fine
Represented By: Keith Beauchamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael O'Connor
Represented By: Keith Beauchamp
Represented By: Katherine Louise Hyde
Represented By: Andrew S Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banner Health
Represented By: Keith Beauchamp
Represented By: Katherine Louise Hyde
Represented By: Andrew S Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Hu
Represented By: Jared Lynn Sutton
Represented By: Randall Papetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Maxfield
Represented By: Jared Lynn Sutton
Represented By: Randall Papetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Volk
Represented By: Keith Beauchamp
Represented By: Katherine Louise Hyde
Represented By: Andrew S Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lyons
Represented By: Jared Lynn Sutton
Represented By: Randall Papetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Maxfield
Represented By: Jared Lynn Sutton
Represented By: Randall Papetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hu
Represented By: Jared Lynn Sutton
Represented By: Randall Papetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Fine
Represented By: Keith Beauchamp
Represented By: Katherine Louise Hyde
Represented By: Andrew S Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael O'Meara
Represented By: Jared Lynn Sutton
Represented By: Randall Papetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lyons
Represented By: Jared Lynn Sutton
Represented By: Randall Papetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown O'Meara
Represented By: Jared Lynn Sutton
Represented By: Randall Papetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean M Dinner
Represented By: Keith Beauchamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Volk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Cohen Dinner
Represented By: Keith Beauchamp
Represented By: Katherine Louise Hyde
Represented By: Andrew S Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seyed Mohsen Sharifi Takieh
Represented By: William A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?