Taft-Hartley Trust Funds et al v. City Plumbing Services LLC
Plaintiff: Arizona Pipefitting Trades Joint Apprenticeship Trust Fund, Arizona Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Taft-Hartley Trust Funds, Pipe Trades Industry Program of Arizona, Arizona Pipe Trades Pension Fund, Arizona Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Pension Plan and Local Union No. 469 of United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of The Plumbing and Pipefitting Trade
Defendant: City Plumbing Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv05913
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER the #15 Notice is GRANTED and that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this action in its entirety. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/20/2020. (LFIG)
February 20, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Arizona Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Pension Plan, Arizona Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Arizona Pipe Trades Pension Fund, Arizona Pipefitting Trades Joint Apprenticeship Trust Fund, Local Union No. 469 of United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of The Plumbing and Pipefitting Trade, Pipe Trades Industry Program of Arizona, Taft-Hartley Trust Funds. (Barrett, Gerald)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Before the Court is a Motion to Extend Time to Effectuate Service (Doc. #13 ). Therein, Plaintiffs request a nearly four-month extension to their deadline to effectuate service, while also stating that "the parties have entered into a settlement agreement." The Court does not find good cause to grant the motion, and therefore IT IS ORDERED the Motion (Doc. #13 ) is denied. If the matter has settled, the parties shall file a notice of settlement, or voluntarily dismiss this action. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/19/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
February 17, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time To Effectuate Service by Arizona Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Pension Plan, Arizona Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Arizona Pipe Trades Pension Fund, Arizona Pipefitting Trades Joint Apprenticeship Trust Fund, Local Union No. 469 of United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of The Plumbing and Pipefitting Trade, Pipe Trades Industry Program of Arizona, Taft-Hartley Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barrett, Gerald)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/2/2020. (LFIG)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to City Plumbing Services LLC. (BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17780958. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-05913-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizona Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Pension Plan, Arizona Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Arizona Pipe Trades Pension Fund, Arizona Pipefitting Trades Joint Apprenticeship Trust Fund, Local Union No. 469 of United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of The Plumbing and Pipefitting Trade, Pipe Trades Industry Program of Arizona, Taft-Hartley Trust Funds. (Barrett, Gerald) (BAC)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Taft-Hartley Trust Funds. (Barrett, Gerald) (BAC)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pipe Trades Industry Program of Arizona. (Barrett, Gerald) (BAC)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Local Union No. 469 of United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of The Plumbing and Pipefitting Trade. (Barrett, Gerald) (BAC)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arizona Pipefitting Trades Joint Apprenticeship Trust Fund. (Barrett, Gerald) (BAC)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arizona Pipe Trades Pension Fund. (Barrett, Gerald) (BAC)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arizona Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund. (Barrett, Gerald) (BAC)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arizona Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Pension Plan. (Barrett, Gerald) (BAC)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-17780958 filed by Pipe Trades Industry Program of Arizona, Arizona Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Pension Plan, Taft-Hartley Trust Funds, Arizona Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Arizona Pipefitting Trades Joint Apprenticeship Trust Fund, Local Union No. 469 of United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of The Plumbing and Pipefitting Trade, Arizona Pipe Trades Pension Fund. (Barrett, Gerald) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taft-Hartley Trust Funds et al v. City Plumbing Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Pipefitting Trades Joint Apprenticeship Trust Fund
Represented By: Gerald Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Gerald Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taft-Hartley Trust Funds
Represented By: Gerald Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pipe Trades Industry Program of Arizona
Represented By: Gerald Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Pipe Trades Pension Fund
Represented By: Gerald Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Pension Plan
Represented By: Gerald Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union No. 469 of United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of The Plumbing and Pipefitting Trade
Represented By: Gerald Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Plumbing Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?