Perkins v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Plaintiff: Jaron D Perkins
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Case Number: 2:2019cv05914
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Filing 19 *NOTICE of Receipt of Order Requiring Rule 26(F) Report by Plaintiff Jaron D Perkins. (Perkins, Jaron D) *Modified to correct event, party noticed on 2/26/2020 (WLP).
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/6/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. The parties shall submit their joint proposed case management plan not less than seven (7) days before the Scheduling Conference. (See attached Order for additional details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/24/2020. (JAMA)
February 18, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Bucon, Ian)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing. The party is required to complete the Electronic Case File Registration form to register as a user with the Clerk's Office and to register as a subscriber to PACER (Public Access to Electronic Records) within five (5) days of the date of this Order. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/13/2020. (WLP)
February 10, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE (Memo) in Opposition to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jaron D Perkins. (6 pages) (WLP)
February 10, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Jaron D Perkins. (WLP)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 *ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file with the Clerk of the Court and serve on opposing counsel a responsive memorandum to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #12 ) no later than February 24, 2020. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/27/2020. (JAMA) *Modified to regenerate NEF on 1/28/2020 (SCH).
January 27, 2020 Filing 12 * MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Bucon, Ian) * Modified to correct event and add additional counsel; attorney noticed on 1/28/2020 (LAD).
January 27, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA identifying Corporate Parent JP Morgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Bucon, Ian)
January 15, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jaron D Perkins: Proof of Service re: Amended Complaint upon JPMorgan Chase Bank NA on 1/13/2020. (WLP)
January 10, 2020 Summons Issued over the counter to plaintiff as to JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (WLP) *** This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase Bank NA filed by Jaron D Perkins.(LAD) (8 pages)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX215643. (LAD)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. #2 ), with leave to file an Amended Application by January 24, 2020. FURTHER ORDERED dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 ) without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint by January 24, 2020. Failure to timely file an Amended Application and Amended Complaint will result in dismissal of this action. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to dismiss this action if Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Application and Amended Complaint by January 24, 2020. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/3/2020. (RMV)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (WLP)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (WLP)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J. Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5914-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (WLP)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Jaron D Perkins. (WLP)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jaron D Perkins. (WLP)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jaron D Perkins.(WLP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaron D Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: John Gary Kerkorian
Represented By: Ian Ormsby Bucon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?