Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Rosendin Electric Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Rosendin Electric Incorporated and DPR Construction
Case Number: 2:2020cv00130
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to DPR Construction, Rosendin Electric Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 30, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Submitted by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Reeves, William)
January 30, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Submitted by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Reeves, William)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 1/17/2020. (DGC, nvo)
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America identifying Corporate Parent The Phoenix Insurance Company, Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Reeves, William)
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #2 Summons Submitted filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Unable to issue summons. Please list one defendant per summons. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (ARC)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17848030. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-130-PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Reeves, William) (ARC)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17848030 filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Reeves, William) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Rosendin Electric Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosendin Electric Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DPR Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: William Courtland Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?