Singh v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Petitioner: Baljit Singh
Respondent: Chad F Wolf, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chuck Keeton, John Ramirez, William P Barr, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Department of Justice, United States Customs and Border Protection, Al Gallmann, Kenneth T Cuccinelli and Jedidah Hussey
Case Number: 2:2020cv00232
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle (PS)
Referring Judge: John Z Boyle
2 Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Alien Detainee - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: This matter is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 3/4/2020. (LMR)
March 4, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Notice of Mootness by William P Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Al Gallmann, Jedidah Hussey, Chuck Keeton, John Ramirez, Chad F Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sichi, Elizabeth)
March 3, 2020 Filing 20 SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: petition/summons/order/declaration/motion upon William Barr on 2/28/20. (GMP) Modified text on 3/11/2020 (SLQ).
March 3, 2020 Filing 19 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: summons/petition/declaration/order/motion upon Jedidah Hussey on 2/26/20. (GMP)
March 2, 2020 Filing 18 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: summons/petition/motion/declaration/order upon Kenneth Cuccinelli on Unknown (no signature or date on card). (GMP)
February 28, 2020 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: summons/petition/order/motion upon Chuck Keeton on 2/24/20. (GMP)
February 25, 2020 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: order, petition, declaration, motion, summons upon U.S. Attorney, District of Arizona on 2/24/20. (SLQ)
February 25, 2020 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: order, petition, declaration, motion, summons upon Al Gallmann on 2/21/20. (SLQ)
February 25, 2020 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: order, petition, declaration, motion, summons upon John Ramirez on 2/21/20. (SLQ)
February 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Kay Sichi on behalf of William P Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Al Gallmann, Jedidah Hussey, Chuck Keeton, John Ramirez, Chad F Wolf. (Sichi, Elizabeth)
February 19, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to William P Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Al Gallmann, Jedidah Hussey, Chuck Keeton, John Ramirez, Chad F Wolf, U.S. Attorney District of Arizona. (SLQ)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Stay of Removal (Doc. #7 ) is denied in part as to Petitioner's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and granted in part as to Petitioner's Motion for a Stay of Removal. A temporary stay of removal is entered. Respondents are enjoined from removing Petitioner Baljit Singh (A# 203-711-670) from the United States pending further order of this Court. Respondents DHS, CBP, USCIS, ICE, and DOJ are dismissed from this action. The Clerk of Court shall email a copy of this Order to the Immigration TRO Distribution List. The Clerk of Court shall serve: (1) a copy of the Summons, (2) the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. #1 ) and Declaration (Doc. #4 ), (3) the Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Stay of Removal (Doc. #6 ), and (4) this Order upon the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona by certified mail addressed to the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court shall also send by certified mail a copy of the Summons, the Petition, the Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Stay of Removal, and this Order to the United States Attorney General pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1)(B) and to Respondents Barr, Wolf, Cuccinelli, Hussey, Ramirez, Gallmann, and Keeton pursuant to Rule 4(i)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge John Z. Boyle pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/18/20. (SLQ)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Staying Removal filed by Baljit Singh. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 * MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Stay of Removal by Baljit Singh. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Bashir Ghazialam, #2 Exhibit PROPOSED ORDER)(Ghazialam, Bashir). *Added MOTION to Stay and removed ex parte designation; attorney noticed on 2/18/2020 (SLQ).
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: (1) The Court declines to grant an emergency stay of removal absent the filing of a separate motion for such relief. (2) The Clerk of Court must promptly email a copy of this Order to Petitioner's counsel. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/3/20. (SLQ)
January 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #4 Declaration filed by Baljit Singh. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Bashir Ghazialam re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) by Petitioner Baljit Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-I)(Ghazialam, Bashir)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by Baljit Singh. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1). Title Page does not include filing attorney information in upper left corner. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MYE)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241). Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 0970-17901511 filed by Baljit Singh. (Ghazialam, Bashir) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MYE)
January 31, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Bashir Ghazialam on behalf of Petitioner Baljit Singh. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad F Wolf
Represented By: Elizabeth Kay Sichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chuck Keeton
Represented By: Elizabeth Kay Sichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Ramirez
Represented By: Elizabeth Kay Sichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P Barr
Represented By: Elizabeth Kay Sichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Al Gallmann
Represented By: Elizabeth Kay Sichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth T Cuccinelli
Represented By: Elizabeth Kay Sichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jedidah Hussey
Represented By: Elizabeth Kay Sichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Baljit Singh
Represented By: Bashir Ghazialam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?