Singh v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Petitioner: Gurwinder Singh
Respondent: Chad F Wolf, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chuck Keeton, John Ramirez, William P Barr, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Department of Justice, Al Gallmann, Jedidah Hussey, Kenneth T Cuccinelli and United States Customs and Border Protection
Case Number: 2:2020cv00233
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine (PS)
Referring Judge: Deborah M Fine
2 Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Alien Detainee - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED ORDER re: #18 Order - The Court having considered the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal (Doc. #17 ) and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action, including all claims, is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all remaining deadlines and scheduled hearings are vacated. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 3/16/20. (LAD)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ** AMENDED BY #19 ORDER ** ORDER - The Court having considered the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal (Doc. 170 ) and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action, including all claims, is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all remaining deadlines and scheduled hearings are vacated. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 3/16/2020. (LAD) Modified on 3/16/2020 (LAD).
March 16, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal (with Prejudice) by William P Barr, Al Gallmann, Jedidah Hussey, Chuck Keeton, John Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hemann, Lisa)
March 11, 2020 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Petition/Motion/Declaration/Order upon Jedidah Hussey on 2/27/2020. (LAD)
March 2, 2020 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Petition/Motion/Declaration/Order upon Chuck Keeton on 2/24/20. (LAD)
March 2, 2020 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Petition/Motion/Declaration/Order upon William Barr on 2/26/2020. (LAD)
February 28, 2020 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Petition/Motion/Declaration/Order upon US Attorney District of AZ, Civil Processing Clerk, on 2/25/20. (LAD)
February 27, 2020 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Petition/Motion/Order upon Al Gallmann on 2/24/2020. (MSA)
February 26, 2020 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Petition/Motion/Order upon John Ramirez on 2/24/2020. (MSA)
February 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lisa M. Hemann appearing for William P Barr, Al Gallmann, Jedidah Hussey, Chuck Keeton, John Ramirez, Chad F Wolf. . (Hemann, Lisa)
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to William P Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Al Gallmann, Jedidah Hussey, Chuck Keeton, John Ramirez, Chad F Wolf, U.S. Attorney, District of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(MSA)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Petitioner's #6 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Stay of Removal is denied in part as to Petitioner's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and granted in part as to Petitioner's Motion for a Stay of Removal. A temporary stay of removal is entered. Respondents are enjoined from removing Petitioner Gurwinder Singh (A# 213-349-490) from the United States pending further order of this Court. Respondents DHS, CBP, USCIS, ICE, and DOJ are dismissed from this action. The Clerk of Court shall serve: a copy of the Summons, the #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #4 Declaration, the #6 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Stay of Removal, and this Order upon the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona by certified mail addressed to the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court shall also send by certified mail a copy of the Summons, the Petition, the Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Stay of Removal, and this Order to the United States Attorney General pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1)(B) and to Respondents Barr, Wolf, Cuccinelli, Hussey, Ramirez, Gallmann, and Keeton pursuant to Rule 4(i)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Petitioner must file a "Notice of Change in Status" with the Clerk of Court within 5 days of any material change in Petitioners immigration or custody status. Petitioner may not include a motion for other relief with the Notice. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Fine pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 2/20/2020. (MSA)
February 14, 2020 Filing 6 *Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Staying Removal by Gurwinder Singh. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Bashir Ghazialam, #2 Exhibit PROPOSED ORDER)(Ghazialam, Bashir) *Modified on 2/18/2020 to remove ex parte designation (MSA).
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court declines to grant an emergency stay of removal absent the filing of a separate motion for such relief. The Clerk of Court must promptly email a copy of this Order to Petitioner's counsel. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 2/3/20. (EJA)
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Bashir Ghazialam re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) by Petitioner Gurwinder Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-I)(Ghazialam, Bashir)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by Gurwinder Singh. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1) Title Page does not include filing attorney information in upper left corner. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (ARC)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241). Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 0970-17901560 filed by Gurwinder Singh. (Ghazialam, Bashir) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ARC)
January 31, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Bashir Ghazialam on behalf of Petitioner Gurwinder Singh. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad F Wolf
Represented By: Lisa Marie Hemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chuck Keeton
Represented By: Lisa Marie Hemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Ramirez
Represented By: Lisa Marie Hemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P Barr
Represented By: Lisa Marie Hemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Al Gallmann
Represented By: Lisa Marie Hemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jedidah Hussey
Represented By: Lisa Marie Hemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth T Cuccinelli
Represented By: Lisa Marie Hemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gurwinder Singh
Represented By: Bashir Ghazialam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?