Hancock v. Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Hancock
Defendant: Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated and Brian Boubek
Case Number: 2:2020cv00269
Filed: February 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice, pursuant to Stipulation for Dismissal #59 , each party to pay their own attorneys' fees and costs. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this action. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/10/21. (SJF)
August 10, 2021 Filing 59 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ryden, Monica)
June 25, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Ryden, Monica)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting the parties Joint Motion to Extend Time for Supplemental Expert Disclosure #55 . Defendants shall provide an initial disclosure of medical/health care experts no later than June 25, 2021. Defendants shall provide full and complete disclosure of medical/health care experts no later than July 14, 2021. Rebuttal expert disclosures, if any, shall be made no later than July 30, 2021. Defendants may depose any rebuttal expert no later than August 31, 2021. The parties shall notify the Court on or before August 11, 2021 whether the case has been resolved through mediation. All other deadlines set forth in the August 28, 2020 Case Management Order #17 as modified by the Court's Orders of March 12, 2021 and April 30, 2021 (Docs. #35 , #44 ) shall remain in full force and effect. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that absent truly unusual circumstances, there will be no further extensions. See document for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/24/2021. (REK)
June 23, 2021 Filing 56 First AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Dr. Hermant Pandey, filed by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Ryden, Monica)
June 22, 2021 Filing 55 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Supplemental Expert Disclosure Second Request by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ryden, Monica)
June 15, 2021 Filing 54 First AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Brian Boubek, filed by Jessica Hancock. (Carden, Joshua)
June 10, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE of Deposition of Theresa Dowell, DNP, filed by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Ryden, Monica)
June 10, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE of Deposition of Dr. Hermant Pandey, filed by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Ryden, Monica)
June 10, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE of Deposition of Bill Tafaro, LCP, filed by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Ryden, Monica)
June 2, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Joshua William Carden. (Carden, Joshua)
May 25, 2021 Filing 49 AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Dr. David Dodick, filed by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Ryden, Monica)
May 19, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Jessica Hancock. (Carden, Joshua)
May 14, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Deposition of Dr. David Dodick, filed by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Gittler, Amy)
May 14, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE of Deposition of Dr. Richard Zimmerman, filed by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Gittler, Amy)
May 14, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Deposition of Dr. Kellie Kruger, filed by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Gittler, Amy)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #41 Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 6/30/2021. Dispositive motions due by 9/24/2021. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/30/21. (DXD)
April 30, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Ryden, Monica)
April 28, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Ryden, Monica)
April 28, 2021 Filing 41 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Other Deadlines , MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gittler, Amy)
April 21, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Ryden, Monica)
April 15, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendants Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Ryden, Monica)
April 13, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #37 Notice of Service of Discovery filed by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by attorney Monica M. Ryden but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney John Coulter. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
April 13, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Coulter, John)
March 22, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Jessica Hancock. (Carden, Joshua)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Deadline. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 3/11/21. (DXD)
March 11, 2021 Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Disclosure of Expert Witnesses by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gittler, Amy)
February 26, 2021 Filing 33 First AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Bill Buck, filed by Jessica Hancock. (Carden, Joshua)
February 24, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Deposition of Becky Blair, filed by Jessica Hancock. (Carden, Joshua)
February 24, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Deposition of Brian Boubek, filed by Jessica Hancock. (Carden, Joshua)
February 24, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Deposition of Johanna Friedrich, filed by Jessica Hancock. (Carden, Joshua)
February 24, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Deposition of Tally Bringas, filed by Jessica Hancock. (Carden, Joshua)
February 24, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Deposition of Tanya Coons, filed by Jessica Hancock. (Carden, Joshua)
February 24, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Deposition of Bill Buck, filed by Jessica Hancock. (Carden, Joshua)
February 24, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) (Fourth) filed by Plaintiff Jessica Hancock. (Carden, Joshua)
February 12, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Deposition of Jessica Hancock, filed by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Ryden, Monica)
February 12, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Deposition of Larry Stokes, filed by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Ryden, Monica)
January 15, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Jessica Hancock. (Carden, Joshua)
December 18, 2020 Filing 22 REPORT of Settlement Talks/Discussions (JOINT) by Jessica Hancock. (Carden, Joshua)
November 9, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Ryden, Monica)
September 25, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) First Supplemental filed by Plaintiff Jessica Hancock. (Carden, Joshua)
September 24, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Ryden, Monica)
September 8, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Jessica Hancock. (Carden, Joshua)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 5/28/2021. Dispositive motions due by 7/23/2021. See attached Order for details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/28/2020. (KFZ)
August 28, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge G Murray Snow: Scheduling Conference held on 8/28/2020. Deadlines discussed and entered. Order to follow. TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES: Joshua Carden for Plaintiff. Monica Ryden for Defendants. (Court Reporter Charlotte Powers.) Hearing held 9:32 AM to 9:38 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, IT IS HEREY ORDERED that the Telephonic Scheduling Conference, presently set for 8/21/20 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED and RESET. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is now set for 8/28/2020 at 9:30 a.m. before Chief Judge G. Murray Snow. The parties are to confirm that the call-in number will remain the same by notice to the chambers email. Ordered by Chief Judge G. Murray Snow. (GMS, ag) ( This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)(GMS, ag)
August 20, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) Plaintiff's Initial MIDP filed by Plaintiff Jessica Hancock. (Carden, Joshua)
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Ryden, Monica)
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) (JOINT) (call info included) filed by Plaintiff Jessica Hancock. (Carden, Joshua)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/21/20 at 9:30 AM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/22/20. (DXD)
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Ryden, Monica)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated.(Ryden, Monica)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting the parties' Motion #7 . Defendants Cultural Experiences Abroad, Inc. and Brian Boubek shall have a one-time extension in which to file an answer/responsive pleading to the Complaint, to and including, June 22, 2020. Thus, the parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP within 30 days of the filing of an answer, as set forth in paragraph (A)(^) of the General Order, will be triggered by Defendants' filing of an answer after this extension. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/19/2020. (REK)
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Brian Boubek, Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gittler, Amy)
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jessica Hancock: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on March 23, 2020 to Brian Boubek . (Carden, Joshua)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jessica Hancock: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on March 23, 2020 to Cultural Experiences Abroad, Inc. . (Carden, Joshua)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on May 5, 2020. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 2/5/2020. (RMV)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
February 4, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17917477. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00269-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
February 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-17917477 filed by Jessica Hancock. (Carden, Joshua) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-D)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hancock v. Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cultural Experiences Abroad Incorporated
Represented By: Amy Jo Gittler
Represented By: Monica Marie Ryden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Boubek
Represented By: Amy Jo Gittler
Represented By: Monica Marie Ryden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hancock
Represented By: Joshua William Carden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?