Guldmann Incorporated v. Vandahl Engineering and Sales Limited et al
Plaintiff: Guldmann Incorporated
Defendant: Vandahl Engineering and Sales Limited, Peter A Vanwolvelaerd and Vandahl Engineering and Sales Limited an Arizona corporation doing business as Vandahl Homecare
Case Number: 2:2020cv00274
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6)) filed by Vandahl Engineering and Sales Limited, Peter A Vanwolvelaerd. (Braddock, Cory)
May 25, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6)) filed by Guldmann Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to amended complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to amended complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to amended complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to amended complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E to amended complaint)(Davisson, Kristi)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Joint Request for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The deadline for Plaintiff to file its Memorandum in Response to Defendants' #15 Motion to Dismiss Case is extended through and including 5/25/2020. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/11/2020. (MMO)
May 8, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Time to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Guldmann Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davisson, Kristi)
April 24, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vandahl Engineering and Sales Limited. (Braddock, Cory)
April 24, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6)) by Vandahl Engineering and Sales Limited, Peter A Vanwolvelaerd. (Braddock, Cory)
April 17, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Kevin M Cox on behalf of Defendant Vandahl Engineering and Sales Limited. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 4/24/2020 for Defendants to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendants' answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/13/2020. (MMO)
April 10, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Vandahl Engineering and Sales Limited, Peter A Vanwolvelaerd. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Braddock, Cory)
March 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Cory L. Braddock; Rachael Peters Pugel appearing for Vandahl Engineering and Sales Limited, Peter A Vanwolvelaerd. . (Braddock, Cory)
March 18, 2020 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Vandahl Engineering and Sales Limited, Peter A Vanwolvelaerd: Acceptance of Service re: Complaint; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Notice to Parties Regarding Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project; General Order 17-08; Summons issued to Vandahl Engineering; Summons issued to Peter VanWolvelaerd; Court Order re Motions to Dismiss upon Cory L. Braddock on 03/18/20. (Braddock, Cory)
February 27, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Guldmann Incorporated. (Davisson, Kristi)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Guldmann Incorporated file its Corporate Disclosure Statement within 10 business days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Guldmann Incorporated. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Form)(MMO)
February 12, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Kristi N Davisson on behalf of Plaintiff Guldmann Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/7/2020. (MMO)
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Guldmann Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1) Title Page does not include filing attorney information in upper left corner. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Guldmann Incorporated. (ARC)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Vandahl Engineering and Sales Limited, Peter A Vanwolvelaerd. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17927207. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-274-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Guldmann Incorporated. (Davisson, Kristi) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ARC)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17927207 filed by Guldmann Incorporated. (Davisson, Kristi) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guldmann Incorporated v. Vandahl Engineering and Sales Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vandahl Engineering and Sales Limited
Represented By: Rachael Marie Peters Pugel
Represented By: Cory L Braddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A Vanwolvelaerd
Represented By: Rachael Marie Peters Pugel
Represented By: Cory L Braddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vandahl Engineering and Sales Limited an Arizona corporation doing business as Vandahl Homecare
Represented By: Rachael Marie Peters Pugel
Represented By: Cory L Braddock
Represented By: Kevin M Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guldmann Incorporated
Represented By: Kristi N Davisson, N
Represented By: Kristi N Davisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?