Larrison et al v. LM General Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Marysol Larrison and Patrick Larrison
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2020cv00287
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - The Court has reviewed the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. (Doc. #13 .) For good cause shown, IT IS ORDERED dismissing this case with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/15/20. (SLQ)
April 14, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by LM General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stafford, Karen)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that this matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate this matter on 4/17/2020 without further leave of Court. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/17/2020. (MMO)
March 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement by LM General Insurance Company. (Stafford, Karen)
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by LM General Insurance Company.(Stafford, Karen)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 3/2/2020 for defendant LM General Insurance Company to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/20/2020. (MMO)
February 18, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by LM General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stafford, Karen)
February 11, 2020 Filing 7 *NOTICE of Service re: #5 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions. (Williamson, Charles) *Modified to clean up text on 2/12/2020 (GMP).
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/7/2020. (MMO)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/7/2020. (MMO)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17928604. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00287-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
February 6, 2020 **STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Demand Jury Trial, Offer of Judgment upon LM General Insurance Company c/o Arizona Department of Insurance on 1/8/20(original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/8/20).(BAC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LM General Insurance Company. (Stafford, Karen) (BAC)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-000313. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-17928604 filed by LM General Insurance Company. (Stafford, Karen) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit A-G)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larrison et al v. LM General Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company
Represented By: Cassandra Victoria Meyer
Represented By: Karen Christine Stafford
Represented By: Victoria Renee Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marysol Larrison
Represented By: Charles Blaine Williamson
Represented By: Curt William Clausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Larrison
Represented By: Charles Blaine Williamson
Represented By: Curt William Clausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?