Preferred Investments LLC et al v. Johnston et al
Plaintiff: Preferred Investments LLC and BLG Consulting PLLC
Defendant: Unknown Parties, Duston Johnston and Monica Johnston
Case Number: 2:2020cv00302
Filed: February 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Filing 15 Acknowledge of Receipt of remand. (SLQ)
February 24, 2020 Filing 14 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Duston Johnston. Reason for return: unable to forward. Document numbers 3, 4, 5. (SLQ)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Removal Jurisdiction #12 , which the Court treats as a motion for reconsideration, is denied. See order for details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/19/2020. (LMR)
February 18, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Removal Jurisdiction by Defendant Duston Johnston. (SLQ)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' #9 Emergency Motion to Remand is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall remand this action back to the Pioneer Justice Court in Pinal County and terminate this action accordingly. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (MSA)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Application (Doc. 2) is granted. Defendants may proceed in forma pauperis without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/13/20. (SLQ)
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court by BLG Consulting PLLC, Preferred Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zinman, Mark)
February 13, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BLG Consulting PLLC. (Zinman, Mark)
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Preferred Investments LLC. (Zinman, Mark)
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to BLG Consulting PLLC, Preferred Investments LLC. (BAS)
February 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAS)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS)
February 11, 2020 *****STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED 2/10/2020*** ANSWER TO Notice of removal by defendant Duston Johnston filed in State Court on 02/07/2020, docketed in U.S. District Court on 2/10/2020 for case management purposes. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Steven P. Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00302-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAS)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Duston Johnston. (BAS)
February 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pioneer Justice Court Pinal County, case number CC2020-000260 filed by Duston Johnston. (Attachments: #1 state court docs)(BAS) Modified on 2/11/2020 to amend file date(BAS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Preferred Investments LLC et al v. Johnston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duston Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preferred Investments LLC
Represented By: Scott Edward Williams
Represented By: Scott Andrew Baluha
Represented By: Mark Bradley Zinman
Represented By: Melissa Alice Parham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLG Consulting PLLC
Represented By: Scott Edward Williams
Represented By: Scott Andrew Baluha
Represented By: Mark Bradley Zinman
Represented By: Melissa Alice Parham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?