Singh v. Wolf et al
Petitioner: Gurpreet Singh
Respondent: Matthew T Albence, Chad Wolf, Henry Lucero, William P Barr, Ken Cuccinelli and Phil Bickham
Case Number: 2:2020cv00348
Filed: February 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Morrissey (PS)
Referring Judge: Michael T Morrissey
2 Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Alien Detainee - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 22 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A), and Petitioner having filed a Motion or Notice of Dismissal, this action is hereby dismissed. (GMP)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Petitioner's #19 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal, construed as a notice of dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), is granted. Petitioner's #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and this action are dismissed without prejudice. The #4 temporary stay of removal entered on February 19, 2020 is lifted. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly and terminate this case. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/13/20. (GMP)
March 9, 2020 Filing 20 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: summons/motion/order/petition upon Phil Bickham on 2/24/20. (GMP)
March 6, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion for Voluntary Dismissal by Gurpreet Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Walsh, Hillary)
March 6, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE re: Change in Status by Gurpreet Singh re: #4 Order on Motion to Stay . (Walsh, Hillary)
February 28, 2020 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: summons/petition/order/motion upon William Barr on 2/25/20. (GMP)
February 26, 2020 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Petition/Motion/Order upon US Attorney, District of Arizona on 2/24/2020. (MSA)
February 20, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Matthew T Albence, William P Barr, Phil Bickham, Ken Cuccinelli, Henry Lucero, Chad Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(MSA)
February 20, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Submitted by Gurpreet Singh. (Walsh, Hillary)
February 20, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Submitted by Gurpreet Singh. (Walsh, Hillary)
February 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #6 Summons Submitted filed by Gurpreet Singh. Complete Address Needed for Chad Wolf. Also, no Summons submitted for Ken Cuccinelli. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document with complete address, and summons for Cuccinelli. Deficiencies must be corrected immediately to comply with Court's order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
February 20, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Submitted by Gurpreet Singh. (Walsh, Hillary)
February 20, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Submitted by Gurpreet Singh. (Walsh, Hillary)
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Submitted by Gurpreet Singh. (Walsh, Hillary)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Gurpreet Singh. (Walsh, Hillary)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Gurpreet Singh. (Walsh, Hillary)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Laurence G. Tinsley, Jr. appearing for William P Barr, Phil Bickham, Ken Cuccinelli, Henry Lucero, Chad Wolf. . (Tinsley, Laurence)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Petitioner's #2 Emergency Motion for Stay of Removal is granted and a temporary stay of removal is entered. Respondents are enjoined from removing Petitioner Gurpreet Singh (A# 203-713-771) from the United States pending further order of this Court. The Clerk of Court shall email a copy of this Order to the Immigration TRO Distribution List. Upon submission of the summonses, the Clerk of Court shall serve: a copy of the Summons, the #1 Petition, the #2 Emergency Motion for Stay of Removal, and this Order upon the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona by certified mail addressed to the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court shall also send by certified mail a copy of the Summons, the Petition, the Emergency Motion for Stay of Removal, and this Order to the United States Attorney General pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1)(B) and to Respondents Wolf, Barr, Albence, Cuccinelli, Lucero, and Bickham pursuant to Rule 4(i)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Petitioner must file a Notice of Change in Status with the Clerk of Court within 5 days of any material change in Petitioner's immigration or custody status. Petitioner may not include a motion for other relief with the Notice. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael T. Morrissey pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/19/2020. (MSA)
February 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (DLC)
February 17, 2020 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay Removal by Gurpreet Singh. (Walsh, Hillary) (DLC)
February 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241). Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 0970-17960527 filed by Gurpreet Singh. (Walsh, Hillary) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit C1)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Laurence G Tinsley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Henry Lucero
Represented By: Laurence G Tinsley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P Barr
Represented By: Laurence G Tinsley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Laurence G Tinsley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Phil Bickham
Represented By: Laurence G Tinsley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gurpreet Singh
Represented By: Hillary Gaston Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?