Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Auto Glass Express LLC et al
Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Company and GEICO Indemnity Company
Defendant: Danielle Dean, Saxton Lafasto, Auto Glass Express LLC and Auto Glass Express LLC doing business as AG Express
Case Number: 2:2020cv00373
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 6/03/2020 at 1:30 p.m. (15 minutes allowed). Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call by arranging for the presence of all other attorneys and self-represented parties, and by calling chambers at the scheduled time. See attached ordered for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 4/17/2020. (ESG)
April 15, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Auto Glass Express LLC, Danielle Dean, Saxton Lafasto. (Broberg, Lance)
April 15, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Saxton Lafasto, Auto Glass Express LLC, Danielle Dean. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Known Claims)(Broberg, Lance)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting the #15 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have until April 15, 2020 to answer Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 4/09/2020. (ESG)
April 7, 2020 Filing 15 *STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Auto Glass Express LLC, Danielle Dean, Saxton Lafasto. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bode, Timothy) *Modified to correct event type on 4/8/2020 (EJA).
April 7, 2020 Filing 14 *NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Christian Bode and Lance Robert Broberg on behalf of Auto Glass Express LLC, Danielle Dean, Saxton Lafasto. (Bode, Timothy) *Modified to add attorney on 4/8/2020 (EJA).
March 24, 2020 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint upon Saxton Lafasto on March 18, 2020. (Thorpe, William)
March 24, 2020 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint upon Danielle N. Dean on March 18, 2020. (Thorpe, William)
March 24, 2020 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint upon Auto Glass Express LLC on March 18, 2020. (Thorpe, William)
March 11, 2020 Remark: Out of state attorneys Max Gershenoff and Jeffrey Murphy removed for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 26, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Barry I Levy and Steven Henesy on behalf of Plaintiffs GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, and Government Employees Insurance Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 20, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (DLC)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on May 19, 2020. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 2/20/2020. (ESG)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 2/20/2020. (ESG)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 2/20/2020. (ESG)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Auto Glass Express LLC, Danielle Dean, Saxton Lafasto. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 *NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (DLC) *Modified on 2/20/2020 to reflect NOD issued in error. (DLC).
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17972348. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-373-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Thorpe, William) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DLC)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17972348 filed by GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company. (Thorpe, William) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 of 5, #3 Exhibit 2-5)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Auto Glass Express LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Dean
Represented By: Timothy Christian Bode
Represented By: Lance Robert Broberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saxton Lafasto
Represented By: Timothy Christian Bode
Represented By: Lance Robert Broberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Glass Express LLC
Represented By: Timothy Christian Bode
Represented By: Lance Robert Broberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Glass Express LLC doing business as AG Express
Represented By: Timothy Christian Bode
Represented By: Lance Robert Broberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Represented By: Jeffrey Murphy
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Represented By: Jeffrey Murphy
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Represented By: Jeffrey Murphy
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Represented By: Jeffrey Murphy
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?