Broadcast Music Incorporated et al v. Sisters & Brothers Investments Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Paul Simon Music, Terry Stafford Music Company, R-Key Darkus Publishing, Rondor Music International Incorporated, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Songs of Universal Incorporated, Broadcast Music Incorporated, Cotillion Music Incorporated, Orbi-Lee Publishing, Roy Boys Llc, Carl Perkins Music Incorporated, Peer International Corporation, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Incorporated, Benny Bird Company Incorporated, Rondor Music International Incorporated doing business as Irving Music and Sony/ATV Songs LLC doing business as Sony/ATV Acuff Rose Music
Defendant: Sabrina Osterman, Sisters & Brothers Investments Incorporated, Paul Osterman, Melissa Yanez-Holiday and Sisters & Brothers Investments Incorporated an Arizona corporation doing business as Bar Vinedo
Case Number: 2:2020cv00395
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT by Benny Bird Company Incorporated, Broadcast Music Incorporated, Carl Perkins Music Incorporated, Cotillion Music Incorporated, Orbi-Lee Publishing, Paul Simon Music, Peer International Corporation, R-Key Darkus Publishing, Rondor Music International Incorporated, Roy Boys Llc, Songs of Universal Incorporated, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Terry Stafford Music Company, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Incorporated, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation. (Deatherage, Mark)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall terminate this case without further order of the Court, if Plaintiffs fails to file either a status report or an application for entry of default within the timeframe specified herein. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/6/2020. (MMO)
March 20, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Benny Bird Company Incorporated, Broadcast Music Incorporated, Carl Perkins Music Incorporated, Cotillion Music Incorporated, Orbi-Lee Publishing, Paul Simon Music, Peer International Corporation, R-Key Darkus Publishing, Rondor Music International Incorporated, Roy Boys Llc, Songs of Universal Incorporated, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Terry Stafford Music Company, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Incorporated, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement, MIDP upon Sisters & Brothers Investments, Inc., Paul and Sabrina Osterman, Melissa Yanez-Holiday on 03/08/2020. (Deatherage, Mark)
February 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Benny Bird Company Incorporated, Broadcast Music Incorporated, Carl Perkins Music Incorporated, Cotillion Music Incorporated, Orbi-Lee Publishing, Paul Simon Music, Peer International Corporation, R-Key Darkus Publishing, Rondor Music International Incorporated, Roy Boys Llc, Songs of Universal Incorporated, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Terry Stafford Music Company, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Incorporated, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation. (Deatherage, Mark)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/24/2020. (MMO)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Paul Osterman, Sabrina Osterman, Sisters & Brothers Investments Incorporated, Melissa Yanez-Holiday. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(MCO)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17985723. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-395-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Benny Bird Company Incorporated, Broadcast Music Incorporated, Carl Perkins Music Incorporated, Cotillion Music Incorporated, Orbi-Lee Publishing, Paul Simon Music, Peer International Corporation, R-Key Darkus Publishing, Rondor Music International Incorporated, Roy Boys Llc, Songs of Universal Incorporated, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Terry Stafford Music Company, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Incorporated, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation. (Deatherage, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MCO)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Benny Bird Company Incorporated, Broadcast Music Incorporated, Carl Perkins Music Incorporated, Cotillion Music Incorporated, Orbi-Lee Publishing, Paul Simon Music, Peer International Corporation, R-Key Darkus Publishing, Rondor Music International Incorporated, Roy Boys Llc, Songs of Universal Incorporated, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Terry Stafford Music Company, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Incorporated, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corporation for Cotillion Music Incorporated, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation; Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment Incorporated for Sony/ATV Songs LLC; Corporate Parent TEGNA Incorporated for Broadcast Music Incorporated; Corporate Parent Brazilian Music Incorporated for Peer International Corporation; Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Rondor Music International Incorporated, Songs of Universal Incorporated, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Incorporated. (Deatherage, Mark) (MCO)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17985723 filed by Orbi-Lee Publishing, Benny Bird Company Incorporated, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Peer International Corporation, Broadcast Music Incorporated, Rondor Music International Incorporated, Paul Simon Music, Songs of Universal Incorporated, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Incorporated, Roy Boys Llc, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation, Carl Perkins Music Incorporated, Cotillion Music Incorporated, R-Key Darkus Publishing, Terry Stafford Music Company. (Deatherage, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music Incorporated et al v. Sisters & Brothers Investments Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Simon Music
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Stafford Music Company
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R-Key Darkus Publishing
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cotillion Music Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orbi-Lee Publishing
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Boys Llc
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Perkins Music Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peer International Corporation
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal-Songs of Polygram International Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny Bird Company Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International Incorporated doing business as Irving Music
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC doing business as Sony/ATV Acuff Rose Music
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabrina Osterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sisters & Brothers Investments Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Osterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Yanez-Holiday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sisters & Brothers Investments Incorporated an Arizona corporation doing business as Bar Vinedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?