Johanson et al v. Casavelli et al
Plaintiff: Gary T Johanson and Donna J Johanson
Defendant: Nicolina Castelli and Nick Casavelli
Case Number: 2:2020cv00496
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Plaintiffs' motion to remand (Doc. #9 ) is granted in part and denied in part. The Clerk of Court shall remand this action to Maricopa County Superior Court. Plaintiffs' request for attorneys' fees is denied without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion to allow electronic filing (Doc. #6 ) and motion to submit electronic record (Doc. #7 ) are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/26/20. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter)(EJA)
March 25, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Donna J Johanson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Remanding Case)(Charles, Christopher)
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE: List of Pending Rulings, Responses, or Replies (from Superior Court) by Nick Casavelli, Nicolina Castelli. (SST) (2 pages)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Submit Electronic Record by Nick Casavelli, Nicolina Castelli. (SST) (1 page)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Nicolina Castelli. (SST) (5 pages)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Nicolina Castelli. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (SST)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (SST)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (SST)
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX217437. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00496-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SST)
March 9, 2020 *****State Court record received on 3/9/2020*****Verified ANSWER to Counterclaim by counter defendants Donna J Johanson, Gary T Johanson.*****Filed in State Court on 12/28/2018, docketed in U.S. District Court on 3/9/2020 for case management purposes.***** (SST)
March 9, 2020 *****State Court record received on 3/9/2020***** ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Nick Casavelli, Nicolina Castelli.*****Filed in State Court on 12/20/2018, docketed in U.S. District Court on 3/9/2020 for case management purposes.***** (SST)
March 9, 2020 *****State Court record received on 3/9/2020*****Amended ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Donna J Johanson, Gary T Johanson by Nicolina Castelli, Nick Casavelli.*****Filed in State Court on 12/12/2018, docketed in U.S. District Court on 3/9/2020 for case management purposes.***** (SST)
March 9, 2020 *****State Court record received on 3/9/2020*****ANSWER to Complaint by Nick Casavelli, Nicolina Castelli. Amended ANSWER to Complaint by Nick Casavelli, Nicolina Castelli.*****Both filed in State Court on 11/21/2017, docketed in U.S. District Court on 3/9/2020 for case management purposes.***** (SST)
March 9, 2020 *****State Court record received on 3/9/2020*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Donna J Johanson, Gary T Johanson: Acceptance of Service re: Verified Complaint, Summons, Certificate Regarding Compulsory Arbitration upon Gregory Hinkel for Nick Casavelli and Nicolina Castelli on 10/25/2017.*****Acceptance of Service of Process for Defendants filed in state court on 10/31/2017, docketed in U.S. District Court on 3/9/2020 for case management purposes.***** (SST) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
March 9, 2020 *****State Court record received on 3/9/2020*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Donna J Johanson, Gary T Johanson: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon attorney Gregory Hinkel for Nick Casavelli and Nicolina Castelli on 10/20/2017. *****Affidavit of Service filed in state court on 10/23/2017, docketed in U.S. District Court on 3/9/2020 for case management purposes.***** (SST) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2017-055490. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX217437 filed by Nicolina Castelli, Nick Casavelli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Records, #2 Exhibit State Court Records, #3 Exhibit State Court Records, #4 Exhibit State Court Records, #5 Exhibit State Court Records, #6 Exhibit State Court Records, #7 Exhibit State Court Records, #8 Exhibit State Court Records, #9 Exhibit State Court Records, #10 Exhibit State Court Records, #11 Exhibit State Court Records) (SST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johanson et al v. Casavelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicolina Castelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Casavelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary T Johanson
Represented By: Bryan Louis Eastin
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna J Johanson
Represented By: Bryan Louis Eastin
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?