Grimes v. Tempe Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Charles T Grimes
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Office, Tempe Police Department, Maricopa County Prosecutor's Office, David Shinn, Paul Penzone, William H Babb, Unknown Percevel, Unknown Berman and Unknown Neff
Case Number: 2:2020cv00548
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle (PS)
Referring Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 16 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX219226. Paid in full. (KFZ)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel #11 is denied. Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #13 is denied. Plaintiff has 30 days from the filing date of this Order to pay the filing and administrative fees for this case or file a notice of voluntarily dismissal. If Plaintiff fails to pay the filing and administrative fees for this case or file a notice of voluntary dismissal within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/28/2020. (REK)
April 23, 2020 Filing 14 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Charles T Grimes (7 pages). (SJF)
April 23, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Charles T Grimes (6 pages). (SJF)
April 22, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Charles T. Grimes in support of Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #6 by Plaintiff Charles T Grimes. (SLQ) (4 pages).
April 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Charles T Grimes. (SLQ) (1 page).
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 "Motion to Transfer Complaint." Plaintiff has 30 days from the filing date of this Order to pay the filing and administrative fees for this case, file an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, or file a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/16/20. (DXD)
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Complaint to CV2020-092668 by Charles T Grimes. (SLQ) (1 page).
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #6 ) is denied without prejudice. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/9/20. (SLQ)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Charles T Grimes. (SST) (18 pages)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Charles T Grimes. (SST) (1 page, missing first page)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is denied without prejudice. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 3/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Application form)(LAD)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (REK)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Charles T Grimes. (2 pages) (REK)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Charles T Grimes. (please note: only page 2 of form submitted) (REK)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Charles T Grimes. (15 pages and envelope) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimes v. Tempe Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tempe Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Prosecutor's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Shinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Penzone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H Babb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Percevel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles T Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?