Rodriguez v. Bell Ford Incorporated
Plaintiff: Mason Rodriguez
Defendant: Bell Ford Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2020cv00585
Filed: March 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT by Mason Rodriguez. (Findsen, Beth)
May 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Mason Rodriguez . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Findsen, Beth)
May 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: Document not in compliance with LRCiv 15.1(b) - The amending party must file a separate notice of filing the amended pleading. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please use event Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) and attach a copy of the amended pleading that indicates in what respect it differs from the pleading which it amends, by bracketing or striking through the text that was deleted and underlining the text that was added. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
May 1, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bell Ford Incorporated filed by Mason Rodriguez.(Findsen, Beth)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (text only): IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a status report by Monday, 5/11/2020. Ordered by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 5/1/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mason Rodriguez: Proof of Service on Defendant Bell Ford, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Findsen, Beth)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDARD CIVIL TRACK INITIAL ORDER - IT IS ORDERED, if not already accomplished prior to the date of this Order, that Plaintiff(s) shall effect service of the Complaint and Summons upon all Defendants no later than 90 days after the filing of the Complaint. This shall serve as notice to the Plaintiff under Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that the Court shall dismiss this action without further notice to the Plaintiff with respect to any Defendant named in the Complaint that is not served in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within that 90- day period. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/23/2020. (WLP)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Bell Ford Incorporated. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #2 Summons Submitted filed by Mason Rodriguez, #1 Complaint filed by Mason Rodriguez. Case Number is incorrect. You will receive the case number when Clerk opens your case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18096723. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Teiborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV20-585-PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Mason Rodriguez. (Findsen, Beth) (MCO)
March 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18096723 filed by Mason Rodriguez. (Findsen, Beth) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Bell Ford Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mason Rodriguez
Represented By: Charles James Panzarella
Represented By: Beth Findsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Ford Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?