American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas v. Turner et al
Plaintiff: American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas
Defendant: Ni'shia Turner, Unknown Turner, Disheka M Kay Dean, Marquez McKinley Turner, Malika Pierson, Jai'don Turner, Unknown Deleon and Geovanny Deleon
Case Number: 2:2020cv00626
Filed: March 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed April 28, 2020, judgment of is entered in favor of Plaintiff American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas and against Defendant Geovanny Deleon as set forth in the Order. This action is hereby terminated. (EJA)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER entering Judgment in favor of Plaintiff American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas ("Hallmark") on its Complaint for Declaratory Relief. FURTHER ORDERED the Parties will bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 4/28/20. (EJA)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas' Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (Doc. #13 ). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED dismissing Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Marquez McKinley Turner, Disheka M. Kay Dean, John Doe Turner, Jane Doe Deleon, Malika Pierson, Jai'don Turner and Ni'shia Turner without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 4/28/20. (MAW)
April 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hedberg, Kelly)
April 27, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION For Entry of Judgment by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hedberg, Kelly)
April 14, 2020 Filing 11 *SERVICE EXECUTED re: Filing Certificate of Service By Private Process Server Upon Defendant Geovanny Deleon ON 4/7/20 by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hedberg, Kelly) *Modified to correct event type on 4/15/2020 (EJA).
April 1, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan R Bolton. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-626-PHX-SRB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 31, 2020 Filing 9 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Disheka M Kay Dean, Geovanny Deleon, Unknown Deleon, Malika Pierson, Jai'don Turner, Marquez McKinley Turner, Ni'shia Turner, Unknown Turner. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18127186. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-626-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 ***CORRECTED at Doc. 6 - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction., Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18127186. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-626-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO) Modified on 3/31/2020 (MCO).
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas. (Hedberg, Kelly) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(MCO)
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas identifying Corporate Parent Hallmark Financial Services Incorporated for American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas. (Hedberg, Kelly) (MCO)
March 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18127186 filed by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas. (Hedberg, Kelly) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas v. Turner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ni'shia Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disheka M Kay Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquez McKinley Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malika Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jai'don Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Deleon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geovanny Deleon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas
Represented By: William W Drury, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly Ann Hedberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?