Urdaneta et al v. Keeton et al
Petitioner: Bismer Rodriguez Alvarez, Landy Sanchez Ramos, Geidys Calzadilla Borrero, Miriam Gomez Cantillano, Jhonnatan Brinez Urdaneta, Noel Mejia Hernandez, Jose Vargas Saucedo and Claudia Avalos Inchicaque
Respondent: Chad Wolf, Cesar Topete, Jason Ciliberti, Chuck Keeton, Albert Carter, Fred Figueroa and John Cantu
Amicus Curiae: Joseph Bick, Kathryn Hampton, Joe Goldenson, Robert L Cohen and Ranit Mishori
Case Number: 2:2020cv00654
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Referring Judge: Steven P Logan
2 Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Alien Detainee - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 59 STATUS REPORT [Joint Status Report] by Noel Mejia Hernandez. (Beaudoin, Kristine)
May 19, 2020 Filing 58 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #57 Notice (Other) Exhibit B1, signed version of Exhibit B, Declaration of Dr. K. Ivens by Respondents John Cantu, Albert Carter, Jason Ciliberti, Fred Figueroa, Chuck Keeton, Cesar Topete, Chad Wolf. (Hemann, Lisa)
May 18, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE re: Compliance by John Cantu, Albert Carter, Jason Ciliberti, Fred Figueroa, Chuck Keeton, Cesar Topete, Chad Wolf re: #56 Order, Set Deadlines . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 2), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 2), #3 Exhibit B)(Hemann, Lisa)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief #1 is granted in part as to Petitioner Noel Mejia Hernandez. Respondents must file a "Notice of Compliance" no later than May 18, 2020 at 12:00 p.m. The parties shall meet and confer and must file a joint status report no later than May 22, 2020. Thereafter, the parties shall meet and confer and must file a joint status report every 14 days, unless otherwise ordered by this Court. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/15/2020. (LMR)
May 13, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE re: of Lodging of Proposed Order by John Cantu, Albert Carter, Jason Ciliberti, Fred Figueroa, Chuck Keeton, Cesar Topete, Chad Wolf . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hemann, Lisa)
May 13, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE re: Filing of Proposed Form of Order by Noel Mejia Hernandez . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casselman, Margo)
May 11, 2020 Filing 53 BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE PUBLIC HEALTH AND HUMAN RIGHTS EXPERTS by Amicus Parties Joseph Bick, Robert L. Cohen, Joe Goldenson, Kathryn Hampton, Ranit Mishori. (WLP)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: (1) The parties shall have until May 13, 2020 to each submit a proposed form of order consistent with this decision. (2) The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241 and Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief (Doc. #1 ) is denied in part as to claims brought on behalf Petitioners Urdaneta, Inchicaque, Cantillano, Saucedo, Alvarez, Ramos, and Borrero, without prejudice to these Petitioners renewing their requests for relief in this action should they be re- detained. The Petition is granted in part as to Petitioner Noel Mejia Hernandez (A# 203- 702-428), as set forth by separate order to be issued following the filing of the parties' proposed form of orders. (3) The unopposed Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief (Doc. #26 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall file the lodged proposed Brief (Doc. #27 ). (4) The Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #19 ) and Request for Status Conference (Doc. #45 ) are denied without prejudice as moot. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/11/2020. (WLP)
May 8, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE re: Petitioner-Plaintiffs' Notice of Twenty-Six (26) Additional Confirmed COVID-19 Cases at La Palma Correctional Center by Bismer Rodriguez Alvarez, Geidys Calzadilla Borrero, Miriam Gomez Cantillano, Noel Mejia Hernandez, Claudia Avalos Inchicaque, Landy Sanchez Ramos, Jose Vargas Saucedo, Jhonnatan Brinez Urdaneta . (Casselman, Margo)
May 1, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE re: Additional Confirmed Cases at La Palma and Supplemental Authority in Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Application for Temporary Restraining Order by Bismer Rodriguez Alvarez, Geidys Calzadilla Borrero, Miriam Gomez Cantillano, Noel Mejia Hernandez, Claudia Avalos Inchicaque, Landy Sanchez Ramos, Jose Vargas Saucedo, Jhonnatan Brinez Urdaneta . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index and Exhibits A-C)(Beaudoin, Kristine)
April 30, 2020 Filing 49 STATUS REPORT by John Cantu, Albert Carter, Jason Ciliberti, Fred Figueroa, Chuck Keeton, Cesar Topete, Chad Wolf. (Hemann, Lisa)
April 28, 2020 Filing 48 REPLY re: #45 Request for Emergency Status Conference by Petitioner Noel Mejia Hernandez. (Beaudoin, Kristine)
April 28, 2020 Filing 47 RESPONSE re: #45 Request for Emergency Status Conference by Respondents John Cantu, Albert Carter, Jason Ciliberti, Fred Figueroa, Chuck Keeton, Cesar Topete, Chad Wolf. (Hemann, Lisa)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Respondents shall have until 12:00 p.m. on Tuesday, April 28, 2020 to file a response to Petitioner's Request #45 . See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/27/2020. (LMR)
April 24, 2020 Filing 45 REQUEST re: Emergency Status Conference by Petitioner Noel Mejia Hernandez. (Beaudoin, Kristine)
April 24, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE re: Five (5) Additional Confirmed Cases of COVID-19 at La Palma Correctional Center by Bismer Rodriguez Alvarez, Geidys Calzadilla Borrero, Miriam Gomez Cantillano, Noel Mejia Hernandez, Claudia Avalos Inchicaque, Landy Sanchez Ramos, Jose Vargas Saucedo, Jhonnatan Brinez Urdaneta . (Beaudoin, Kristine)
April 24, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE re: Change in Status by Landy Sanchez Ramos . (Beaudoin, Kristine)
April 23, 2020 Remark: Out of state attorney Victoria Lopez removed as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED:(1) Petitioner's Motion to Transfer (Doc. #31 ) is granted. (2) The Clerk of Court shall transfer Gutierrez-Lopez v. Figueroa, CV-20-00732- PHX-JAT (JFM) to this Court. (3) All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following case number: CV-20-00732-PHX-SPL (JFM). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/21/2020. (Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00514-SPL--MTM, 2:20-cv-00654-SPL--JFM, 2:20-cv-00732-JAT--JFM) (WLP)
April 20, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE re: Seven (7) Additional Confirmed COVID-19 Cases at La Palma Correctional Center by Bismer Rodriguez Alvarez, Geidys Calzadilla Borrero, Miriam Gomez Cantillano, Noel Mejia Hernandez, Claudia Avalos Inchicaque, Landy Sanchez Ramos, Jose Vargas Saucedo, Jhonnatan Brinez Urdaneta . (Beaudoin, Kristine)
April 20, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Anand Balakrishnan, Michael King Thomas Tan, and Omar C Jadwat on behalf of Petitioners Bismer Rodriguez Alvarez, Geidys Calzadilla Borrero, Miriam Gomez Cantillano, Noel Mejia Hernandez, Claudia Avalos Inchicaque, Landy Sanchez Ramos, Jose Vargas Saucedo, and Jhonnatan Brinez Urdaneta. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 20, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE re: Change in Status by Geidys Calzadilla Borrero . (Beaudoin, Kristine)
April 20, 2020 Filing 39 REPLY in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241), #19 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction, by Petitioners Bismer Rodriguez Alvarez, Geidys Calzadilla Borrero, Miriam Gomez Cantillano, Noel Mejia Hernandez, Claudia Avalos Inchicaque, Landy Sanchez Ramos, Jose Vargas Saucedo, Jhonnatan Brinez Urdaneta. (Attachments: #1 Index and Exhibits A-G)(WLP)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Petitioners-Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Exceed (Doc. #34 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall file the lodged proposed Reply (Doc. #35 ). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/20/2020. (WLP)
April 20, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE re: Supplemental Authority in Support of Petition for Habeas Corpus and Application for TRO by Bismer Rodriguez Alvarez, Geidys Calzadilla Borrero, Miriam Gomez Cantillano, Noel Mejia Hernandez, Claudia Avalos Inchicaque, Landy Sanchez Ramos, Jose Vargas Saucedo, Jhonnatan Brinez Urdaneta . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beaudoin, Kristine)
April 20, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Darren W Johnson and David Kimball-Stanley on behalf of Amicus Parties Joseph Bick, Robert L. Cohen, Joe Goldenson, Kathryn Hampton, and Ranit Mishori. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 17, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to Transfer Related Case by Perla Beatriz Gutierrez-Lopez. (Associated Cases: CV-20-654-PHX-SPL (FJM), CV-20-732-PHX-JAT (JFM)) (LAD) (redocketed by the clerk for administrative purposes, entitled Petitioner's Motion for Voluntary Transfer of Case)
April 17, 2020 Filing 35 *Filed at Doc. #39 pursuant to #38 Order - LODGED Proposed Reply in Support of Petition for Habeas Corpus and in Support of Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction re: #34 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply in Support of Petition for Habeas Corpus and in Support of Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Bismer Rodriguez Alvarez, Geidys Calzadilla Borrero, Miriam Gomez Cantillano, Noel Mejia Hernandez, Claudia Avalos Inchicaque, Landy Sanchez Ramos, Jose Vargas Saucedo, Jhonnatan Brinez Urdaneta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index and Exhibits A-G)(Beaudoin, Kristine) Modified on 4/20/2020 (WLP).
April 17, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply in Support of Petition for Habeas Corpus and in Support of Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction by Bismer Rodriguez Alvarez, Geidys Calzadilla Borrero, Miriam Gomez Cantillano, Noel Mejia Hernandez, Claudia Avalos Inchicaque, Landy Sanchez Ramos, Jose Vargas Saucedo, Jhonnatan Brinez Urdaneta. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beaudoin, Kristine)
April 16, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Susanna M Buergel on behalf of Amicus Parties Joseph Bick, Robert L. Cohen, Joe Goldenson, Kathryn Hampton, and Ranit Mishori. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 15, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE re: Change in Status by Bismer Rodriguez Alvarez . (Beaudoin, Kristine)
April 14, 2020 Filing 32 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: summons/petition/order upon US Attorney General on 4/10/20. (GMP)
April 13, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #19 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by John Cantu, Albert Carter, Jason Ciliberti, Fred Figueroa, Chuck Keeton, Cesar Topete, Chad Wolf. (Hemann, Lisa)
April 13, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) by John Cantu, Albert Carter, Jason Ciliberti, Fred Figueroa, Chuck Keeton, Cesar Topete, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J)(Hemann, Lisa)
April 13, 2020 Filing 29 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Petition upon Chuck Keeton, Warden on 4/8/20 (signed by J Manning) (1 page). (SJF)
April 10, 2020 Filing 28 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: summons/petition/order upon Fred Figueroa on 4/7/20. (GMP)
April 10, 2020 Filing 27 *Filed at Doc. #53 pursuant to Order #52 -- LODGED Proposed BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE PUBLIC HEALTH AND HUMAN RIGHTS EXPERTS re: #26 MOTION for Leave to File FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE PUBLIC HEALTH AND HUMAN RIGHTS EXPERTS . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Joseph Bick, Robert L. Cohen, Joe Goldenson, Kathryn Hampton, Ranit Mishori. (Bendor, Joshua) *Modified on 5/11/2020 (WLP).
April 10, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE PUBLIC HEALTH AND HUMAN RIGHTS EXPERTS by Joseph Bick, Robert L. Cohen, Joe Goldenson, Kathryn Hampton, Ranit Mishori. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bendor, Joshua)
April 10, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE re: Change in Status by Miriam Gomez Cantillano . (Beaudoin, Kristine)
April 9, 2020 Filing 25 SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Petition/Order upon the U.S. Attorney for the District of Arizona (attn: civil processing clerk) on 4/8/20. (SST)
April 9, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction, and Memorandum of Points & Authorities by Bismer Rodriguez Alvarez, Geidys Calzadilla Borrero, Miriam Gomez Cantillano, Noel Mejia Hernandez, Claudia Avalos Inchicaque, Landy Sanchez Ramos, Jose Vargas Saucedo, Jhonnatan Brinez Urdaneta. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GMP)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Petitioners-Plaintiffs' #7 Motion for Leave to Exceed is granted. The Clerk of Court shall file the lodged proposed #8 Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction. Respondents-Defendants shall have until 5:00 p.m. on Monday, April 13, 2020 to file an Answer to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241 and a Response to the Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction. Respondents-Defendants shall not file a dispositive motion in place of an answer or response absent leave of Court. Petitioners-Plaintiffs shall have until 5:00 p.m. on Friday, April 17, 2020 to file a Reply to Respondents-Defendants' Answer and Response. Petitioners-Plaintiffs must file a "Notice of Change in Status" with the Clerk of Court within 2 days of any material change in their custody status. Petitioners may not include a motion for other relief with the Notice. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/8/20. (GMP)
April 8, 2020 Filing 23 SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Petition/Order upon Jason Ciliberti on 4/7/20. (SST)
April 8, 2020 Filing 22 SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Petition/Order upon Cesar Topete on 4/7/20. (SST)
April 8, 2020 Filing 21 SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Petition/Order upon John Cantu on 4/7/20. (SST)
April 8, 2020 Filing 20 SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Petition/Order upon Albert Carter on 4/7/20. (SST)
April 8, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE re: Change in Status by Jose Vargas Saucedo . (Beaudoin, Kristine)
April 8, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE re: Petitioners' Motion to Transfer by John Cantu, Albert Carter, Jason Ciliberti, Fred Figueroa, Chuck Keeton, Cesar Topete, Chad Wolf re: #14 Order, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings . (Hemann, Lisa)
April 7, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Eunice Cho and David Cyrus Fathi on behalf of Petitioners Bismer Rodriguez Alvarez, Geidys Calzadilla Borrero, Miriam Gomez Cantillano, Noel Mejia Hernandez, Claudia Avalos Inchicaque, Landy Sanchez Ramos, Jose Vargas Saucedo, and Jhonnatan Brinez Urdaneta. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 6, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lisa M. Hemann appearing for John Cantu, Albert Carter, Jason Ciliberti, Cesar Topete, Chad Wolf. . (Hemann, Lisa)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Respondents-Defendants may file a response to Petitioners-Plaintiffs' #13 Motion to Transfer no later than 12:00 p.m. on Wednesday, April 8, 2020. If Respondents-Defendants elect to file a response, Petitioners-Plaintiffs may file a reply no later than 12:00 p.m. on Thursday, April 9, 2020. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/6/2020. (MSA)
April 6, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Transfer Related Case (Motion to Transfer Case to Judge Steven P. Logan) by Bismer Rodriguez Alvarez, Geidys Calzadilla Borrero, Miriam Gomez Cantillano, Noel Mejia Hernandez, Claudia Avalos Inchicaque, Landy Sanchez Ramos, Jose Vargas Saucedo, Jhonnatan Brinez Urdaneta. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-20-00654-PHX-JAT, CV-20-00514-PHX-SPL) (Barr, Daniel)
April 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #6 MOTION Transfer Case to Judge Steven P. Logan filed by Claudia Avalos Inchicaque, Jhonnatan Brinez Urdaneta, Bismer Rodriguez Alvarez, Landy Sanchez Ramos, Miriam Gomez Cantillano, Jose Vargas Saucedo, Noel Mejia Hernandez, Geidys Calzadilla Borrero. Incorrect event selected: Motion for Miscellaneous Relief found in the Motions category. Correct event: Motion to Transfer Related Case found in the LR 42 Motions category. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile using the correct LR 42 Motion event. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
April 6, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to John Cantu, Albert Carter, Jason Ciliberti, Fred Figueroa, Chuck Keeton, Cesar Topete, Chad Wolf, US Attorney General, US Attorney for the District of Arizona. (GMP)
April 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE re: Change in Status by Claudia Avalos Inchicaque, Jhonnatan Brinez Urdaneta . (Beaudoin, Kristine)
April 3, 2020 Filing 8 *(filed at doc. #19 ) - LODGED Proposed Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction, and Memorandum of Points & Authorities re: #7 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Temporary Restraining Order . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Bismer Rodriguez Alvarez, Geidys Calzadilla Borrero, Miriam Gomez Cantillano, Noel Mejia Hernandez, Claudia Avalos Inchicaque, Landy Sanchez Ramos, Jose Vargas Saucedo, Jhonnatan Brinez Urdaneta. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casselman, Margo) Modified on 4/9/2020 (GMP).
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Temporary Restraining Order by Bismer Rodriguez Alvarez, Geidys Calzadilla Borrero, Miriam Gomez Cantillano, Noel Mejia Hernandez, Claudia Avalos Inchicaque, Landy Sanchez Ramos, Jose Vargas Saucedo, Jhonnatan Brinez Urdaneta. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casselman, Margo)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 * MOTION Transfer Case to Judge Steven P. Logan by Bismer Rodriguez Alvarez, Geidys Calzadilla Borrero, Miriam Gomez Cantillano, Noel Mejia Hernandez, Claudia Avalos Inchicaque, Landy Sanchez Ramos, Jose Vargas Saucedo, Jhonnatan Brinez Urdaneta. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Daniel) *Incorrect event used, attorney noticed to refile using correct LR 42 Motions event on 4/6/2020 (WLP).
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Clerk of Court shall serve: a copy of the Summons, the #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241 and Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief, and this Order upon the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona by certified mail addressed to the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney pursuant to Rule 4(i) (1)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court shall also send by certified mail a copy of the Summons, the Petition, and this Order to the United States Attorney General pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1)(B) and to Respondents Keeton, Figueroa, Carter, Topete, Ciliberti, Cantu, and Wolf pursuant to Rule 4(i)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court must send a copy of this order by separate email to the Immigration TRO Group. Petitioners must file a "Notice of Change in Status" with the Clerk of Court within 2 days of any material change in their custody status. Petitioners may not include a motion for other relief with the Notice. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/3/20. (GMP)
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (REK)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Bismer Rodriguez Alvarez, Geidys Calzadilla Borrero, Miriam Gomez Cantillano, Noel Mejia Hernandez, Claudia Avalos Inchicaque, Landy Sanchez Ramos, Jose Vargas Saucedo, Jhonnatan Brinez Urdaneta. (submitted by Howard Cabot) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (REK)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Kristine J. Beaudoin re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) by Petitioners Bismer Rodriguez Alvarez, Geidys Calzadilla Borrero, Miriam Gomez Cantillano, Noel Mejia Hernandez, Claudia Avalos Inchicaque, Landy Sanchez Ramos, Jose Vargas Saucedo, Jhonnatan Brinez Urdaneta. (submitted by Howard Carter) (REK)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241). Filing fee received: $5.00, receipt number 0970-18137120 filed by Landy Sanchez Ramos, Miriam Gomez Cantillano, Bismer Rodriguez Alvarez, Geidys Calzadilla Borrero, Jhonnatan Brinez Urdaneta, Noel Mejia Hernandez, Claudia Avalos Inchicaque, Jose Vargas Saucedo. (submitted by Howard Cabot) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Urdaneta et al v. Keeton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bismer Rodriguez Alvarez
Represented By: Laura McClure St John
Represented By: Kristine Jolie Beaudoin
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Anand Balakrishnan
Represented By: Howard Ross Cabot
Represented By: Katharine Elizabeth Ruhl
Represented By: Margo Rose Casselman
Represented By: Michael King Thomas Tan
Represented By: Yvette Borja
Represented By: Victoria Lopez
Represented By: David Cyrus Fathi
Represented By: Eunice Cho
Represented By: Omar C Jadwat
Represented By: Christopher David Thomas
Represented By: Aleyda Yvette Borja
Represented By: Laura Belous
Represented By: Laura McClure StJohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Landy Sanchez Ramos
Represented By: Laura McClure St John
Represented By: Kristine Jolie Beaudoin
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Anand Balakrishnan
Represented By: Howard Ross Cabot
Represented By: Katharine Elizabeth Ruhl
Represented By: Margo Rose Casselman
Represented By: Michael King Thomas Tan
Represented By: Yvette Borja
Represented By: Victoria Lopez
Represented By: David Cyrus Fathi
Represented By: Eunice Cho
Represented By: Omar C Jadwat
Represented By: Christopher David Thomas
Represented By: Aleyda Yvette Borja
Represented By: Laura Belous
Represented By: Laura McClure StJohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Geidys Calzadilla Borrero
Represented By: Laura McClure St John
Represented By: Kristine Jolie Beaudoin
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Anand Balakrishnan
Represented By: Howard Ross Cabot
Represented By: Katharine Elizabeth Ruhl
Represented By: Margo Rose Casselman
Represented By: Michael King Thomas Tan
Represented By: Yvette Borja
Represented By: Victoria Lopez
Represented By: David Cyrus Fathi
Represented By: Eunice Cho
Represented By: Omar C Jadwat
Represented By: Christopher David Thomas
Represented By: Aleyda Yvette Borja
Represented By: Laura Belous
Represented By: Laura McClure StJohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miriam Gomez Cantillano
Represented By: Laura McClure St John
Represented By: Kristine Jolie Beaudoin
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Anand Balakrishnan
Represented By: Howard Ross Cabot
Represented By: Katharine Elizabeth Ruhl
Represented By: Margo Rose Casselman
Represented By: Michael King Thomas Tan
Represented By: Yvette Borja
Represented By: Victoria Lopez
Represented By: David Cyrus Fathi
Represented By: Eunice Cho
Represented By: Omar C Jadwat
Represented By: Christopher David Thomas
Represented By: Aleyda Yvette Borja
Represented By: Laura Belous
Represented By: Laura McClure StJohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jhonnatan Brinez Urdaneta
Represented By: Laura McClure St John
Represented By: Kristine Jolie Beaudoin
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Anand Balakrishnan
Represented By: Howard Ross Cabot
Represented By: Katharine Elizabeth Ruhl
Represented By: Margo Rose Casselman
Represented By: Michael King Thomas Tan
Represented By: Yvette Borja
Represented By: Victoria Lopez
Represented By: David Cyrus Fathi
Represented By: Eunice Cho
Represented By: Omar C Jadwat
Represented By: Christopher David Thomas
Represented By: Aleyda Yvette Borja
Represented By: Laura Belous
Represented By: Laura McClure StJohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Noel Mejia Hernandez
Represented By: Laura McClure St John
Represented By: Kristine Jolie Beaudoin
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Anand Balakrishnan
Represented By: Howard Ross Cabot
Represented By: Katharine Elizabeth Ruhl
Represented By: Margo Rose Casselman
Represented By: Michael King Thomas Tan
Represented By: Yvette Borja
Represented By: Victoria Lopez
Represented By: David Cyrus Fathi
Represented By: Eunice Cho
Represented By: Omar C Jadwat
Represented By: Christopher David Thomas
Represented By: Aleyda Yvette Borja
Represented By: Laura Belous
Represented By: Laura McClure StJohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Vargas Saucedo
Represented By: Laura McClure St John
Represented By: Kristine Jolie Beaudoin
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Anand Balakrishnan
Represented By: Howard Ross Cabot
Represented By: Katharine Elizabeth Ruhl
Represented By: Margo Rose Casselman
Represented By: Michael King Thomas Tan
Represented By: Yvette Borja
Represented By: Victoria Lopez
Represented By: David Cyrus Fathi
Represented By: Eunice Cho
Represented By: Omar C Jadwat
Represented By: Christopher David Thomas
Represented By: Aleyda Yvette Borja
Represented By: Laura Belous
Represented By: Laura McClure StJohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Claudia Avalos Inchicaque
Represented By: Laura McClure St John
Represented By: Kristine Jolie Beaudoin
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Anand Balakrishnan
Represented By: Howard Ross Cabot
Represented By: Katharine Elizabeth Ruhl
Represented By: Margo Rose Casselman
Represented By: Michael King Thomas Tan
Represented By: Yvette Borja
Represented By: Victoria Lopez
Represented By: David Cyrus Fathi
Represented By: Eunice Cho
Represented By: Omar C Jadwat
Represented By: Christopher David Thomas
Represented By: Aleyda Yvette Borja
Represented By: Laura Belous
Represented By: Laura McClure StJohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Lisa Marie Hemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cesar Topete
Represented By: Lisa Marie Hemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jason Ciliberti
Represented By: Lisa Marie Hemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chuck Keeton
Represented By: Lisa Marie Hemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Albert Carter
Represented By: Lisa Marie Hemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fred Figueroa
Represented By: Lisa Marie Hemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Cantu
Represented By: Lisa Marie Hemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joseph Bick
Represented By: David Kimball-Stanley
Represented By: Susanna M Buergel
Represented By: Joshua David R Bendor
Represented By: Darren W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kathryn Hampton
Represented By: David Kimball-Stanley
Represented By: Susanna M Buergel
Represented By: Joshua David R Bendor
Represented By: Darren W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joe Goldenson
Represented By: David Kimball-Stanley
Represented By: Susanna M Buergel
Represented By: Joshua David R Bendor
Represented By: Darren W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Robert L Cohen
Represented By: David Kimball-Stanley
Represented By: Susanna M Buergel
Represented By: Joshua David R Bendor
Represented By: Darren W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ranit Mishori
Represented By: David Kimball-Stanley
Represented By: Susanna M Buergel
Represented By: Joshua David R Bendor
Represented By: Darren W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?