Arizonans for Fair Elections et al v. Hobbs et al
Plaintiff: Arizonans for Fair Elections, Randi L Turk and Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare
Defendant: Sharie Miheiro, Kristi Blair, David Stevens, Patty Hansen, F Ann Rodriguez, Virginia Ross, Katie Hobbs, Doris Clark, Richard Garcia, Edison Wauneka, Adrian Fontes, Wendy John, Sadie Jo Bingham, Leslie Hoffman, Robyn Pouquette and Suzanne Sainz
Petitioner: President of the Arizona Senate and Speaker of the Arizona House of Representatives
Amicus Curiae: Arizona Free Enterprise Club, Arizona Republican Party and Goldwater Institute
Intervenor Defendant: Arizona, State of
Case Number: 2:2020cv00658
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 108 MANDATE of USCA (20-15719) granting appellants' motion to dismiss re: #106 Notice of Appeal filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Randi L Turk, Arizonans for Fair Elections. The parties shall bear their own costs on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. (LAD)
April 21, 2020 Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Fee Received: $ 505.00 receipt number 0970-18204117. (Barton, James)
April 21, 2020 Filing 107 USCA Case Number re: #106 Notice of Appeal. Case number 20-15719, Ninth Circuit. (LAD)
April 20, 2020 Filing 106 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #103 Order, #104 Clerks Judgment by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections, Randi L Turk. NOTE: Doc #105 redocketd using correct event. (DXD)
April 20, 2020 Filing 105 *Redocket at Doc. #106 ** NOTICE re: Notice of Appeal by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections, Randi L Turk. (Barton, James) *Modified to docket using correct event/ add filer on 4/20/2020 (DXD).
April 17, 2020 Filing 104 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's Order filed April 17, 2020, judgment of dismissal due to lack of subject matter jurisdiction is entered. Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice. (DXD)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is dismissed without prejudice due to a lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiffs' Motion for a TRO (Doc. #2 ) is denied as moot. The Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. #82 -) is denied as moot. The State's Conditional Motion to Certify questions to the Arizona Supreme Court (Docs. #99 , #100 ) are denied as moot. The Clerk shall terminate this action and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/17/20. (DXD)
April 17, 2020 Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #100 MOTION Conditional Request To Certify Issue To Arizona Supreme Court (Corrected PDF) filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. (Barton, James)
April 17, 2020 Filing 100 MOTION Conditional Request To Certify Issue To Arizona Supreme Court (Corrected PDF) by Arizona, State of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ensign, Drew)
April 16, 2020 Filing 99 MOTION Conditional Request To Certify Issue To Arizona Supreme Court by Arizona, State of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ensign, Drew)
April 15, 2020 Filing 102 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING proceedings held on 04/14/2020, before Judge DOMINIC W. LANZA. [Court Reporter: Candy L. Potter, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (602) 322-7246]. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/6/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/14/2020. (RAP)
April 15, 2020 Filing 98 AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST pursuant to 97 Notice of Deficiency by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections for proceedings held on 4/14/2020, Judge Dominic W Lanza hearing judge(s). (Barton, James)
April 15, 2020 Filing 97 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #96 Transcript Request filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) ELECTRONIC FILING - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with sections 1 & 19 matching the name of the ECF registered user under whose log-in and password the document will be re-submitted under. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RAP)
April 15, 2020 Filing 96 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections for proceedings held on 4/14/2020, Judge Dominic W Lanza hearing judge(s). (Barton, James)
April 15, 2020 Filing 95 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Suzanne Sainz. Amendment to #84 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel . (Hunley, Kimberly)
April 15, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #88 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
April 14, 2020 Filing 93 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST State of Arizona's Transcript Request re 4/14/2020 Telephonic Motion Hearing by Arizona, State of for proceedings held on 4/14/2020, Judge Dominic W Lanza hearing judge(s). (Makar, Robert)
April 14, 2020 Filing 92 Amicus Curiae BRIEF by Amicus Goldwater Institute. (GMP)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: For the reasons given in the Court's April 13, 2020 order (Doc. #83 ), IT IS ORDERED that the Goldwater Institute's motion to file amicus curiae brief (Doc. #89 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the amicus brief (Doc. 89-1). No response or reply will be permitted regarding the amicus brief unless later ordered by the Court. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/14/20. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
April 14, 2020 Filing 90 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Dominic W Lanza: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 4/14/2020. Argument held. IT IS ORDERED taking under advisement #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by James Barton, II, for Plaintiffs. Telephonic appearances by Jeffrey Haws, Jason Moore, Joseph LaRue, Rose Winkeler, Daniel Arellano, Roy Herrera, Jr., Wiliam Kerekes, Daniel Jurkowitz, Craig Cameron and Kimberly Hunley for Defendants. Telephonic appearance by Drew Ensign for Intervenor Defendant. Telephonic appearance by Aaron Brown for the Speaker of the Arizona House of Representatives and the President of the Arizona State Senate. Also present on the phone: Jeff Dalton for Defendant Sadie Bingham, Thomas Stoxen for Defendant Leslie Hoffman and Jeremy Ford for Defendant Sharie Miheiro. (Court Reporter Candy Potter) Hearing held 10:38 AM to 12:04 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
April 14, 2020 Filing 89 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Goldwater Institute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Amicus Brief)(Sandefur, Timothy)
April 14, 2020 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Joyce Roberts on behalf of David Stevens. (Roberts, Christine)
April 14, 2020 Filing 87 Amicus Curiae BRIEF by Amicus Arizona Free Enterprise Club. (DXD)
April 14, 2020 Filing 86 Amicus Curaie BRIEF by Amicus Arizona Republican Party. (DXD)
April 13, 2020 Filing 85 Joinder re: #62 Response to Motion FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Defendant Suzanne Sainz. filed by Suzanne Sainz. (Hunley, Kimberly)
April 13, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Janiece Hunley on behalf of Suzanne Sainz. (Hunley, Kimberly)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Arizona Republican Party's motion for leave to file an amicus brief (Doc. #76 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the amicus brief (Doc. 76-1). No response or reply will be permitted regarding the amicus brief unless later ordered by the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Arizona Free Enterprise Club's motion for leave to file an amicus brief (Doc. #80 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the amicus brief (Doc. 80-1). No response or reply will be permitted regarding the amicus brief unless later ordered by the Court [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/13/20. (MAW)
April 13, 2020 Filing 82 MOTION for Reconsideration re: #75 Order on Motion to Intervene by President of the Arizona Senate, Speaker of the Arizona House of Representatives. (Cantelme, David)
April 13, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Rose Marie Winkeler on behalf of Patty Hansen. (Winkeler, Rose)
April 13, 2020 Filing 80 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Timothy Andrew LaSota on behalf of Arizona Free Enterprise Club. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief)(LaSota, Timothy)
April 12, 2020 Filing 79 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Affidavit of Christopher Gallaway by Plaintiffs Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. (Barton, James)
April 10, 2020 Filing 78 RESPONSE to Motion re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Response of Arizona Secretary of State Katie Hobbs to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Katie Hobbs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dul Declaration)(Herrera, Roy)
April 10, 2020 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Corrected Brief) filed by Arizona, State of. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Makar Declaration)(Ensign, Drew)
April 10, 2020 Filing 76 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae by The Arizona Republican Party. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Wilenchik, John)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Proposed Intervenors' motion to intervene (Doc. #60 ) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED authorizing Proposed Intervenors to file an amicus brief [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/10/20. (MAW)
April 10, 2020 Filing 74 **Corrected at (Doc. #77 )** RESPONSE in Opposition re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Arizona, State of. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Makar Declaration)(Ensign, Drew) *Modified on 4/13/2020 (DXD).
April 10, 2020 Filing 73 RESPONSE to Motion re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Kristi Blair. (Haws, Jeffrey)
April 10, 2020 Filing 72 Joinder re: #65 Response to Motion, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Defendant Doris Clark. filed by Doris Clark. (Moore, Jason)
April 10, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Blane Haws on behalf of Kristi Blair. (Haws, Jeffrey)
April 10, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Abraham Arellano on behalf of Katie Hobbs. (Arellano, Daniel)
April 10, 2020 Filing 69 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #60 MOTION to Intervene filed by President of the Arizona Senate, Speaker of the Arizona House of Representatives. (Cantelme, David)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: The Court has received inquiries from media representatives who wish to listen to the April 14, 2020, motion hearing telephonically. Although the usual rule is that federal district courts may not broadcast their proceedings, the Executive Committee of the Judicial Conference recently issued a guidance document that "approve[s] a temporary exception to the policy to allow a judge to authorize the use of teleconference technology to provide the public and the media audio access to court proceedings while public access to federal courthouses generally, or with respect to a particular district, is restricted due to health and safety concerns during the Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) pandemic." Given this development, public access to the April 14, 2020 hearing telephonically will be permitted. Those seeking access are directed to call (866) 390-1828; Access Code: 9667260 at least five minutes before the scheduled hearing. Participants are reminded that audiotaping the proceedings is prohibited. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/10/20. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
April 10, 2020 Filing 67 Joinder re: #62 Response to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Defendant Robyn Pouquette. (Kerekes, William)
April 10, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by William J Kerekes on behalf of Robyn Pouquette. (Kerekes, William)
April 10, 2020 Filing 65 *RESPONSE to Motion re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Virginia Ross. (Cameron, Craig) *Document not in Compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c). Attorney Notified on 4/13/2020 (DXD).
April 10, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Charles Cameron on behalf of Virginia Ross. (Cameron, Craig)
April 10, 2020 Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #60 MOTION to Intervene filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. (Barton, James)
April 9, 2020 Filing 62 RESPONSE to Motion re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Adrian Fontes. (LaRue, Joseph)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the State of Arizona's motion to intervene (Doc. #46 ) is granted. As set out in a prior order, the State's response to the TRO motion is due no later than April 10, 2020 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/9/20. (MAW)
April 8, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION to Intervene by Speaker of the Arizona House of Representatives, President of the Arizona Senate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Draft Answer, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cantelme, David)
April 8, 2020 Filing 59 *RESPONSE in Opposition re: #46 MOTION to Intervene filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections, Randi L Turk. (Barton, James) *Modified to add filer on 4/9/2020 (DXD).
April 8, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S Jurkowitz on behalf of F Ann Rodriguez. (Jurkowitz, Daniel)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the State of Arizona's motion to intervene (Doc. #46 ) and is inclined to grant it. However, because Plaintiffs appear to oppose the motion, they will be given an opportunity to respond before any final determination is made. Plaintiffs' response is due by Noon on April 9, 2020. This schedule will permit the State to comply with the existing TRO briefing schedule (Doc. #9 ) if intervention is permitted. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/8/20. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
April 8, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Eugene LaRue on behalf of Adrian Fontes. (LaRue, Joseph)
April 8, 2020 Filing 55 Summons Issued as to Edison Wauneka. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 7, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Norton Dooley on behalf of Richard Garcia. (Dooley, Ryan)
April 7, 2020 Filing 53 RESPONSE to Motion re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by F Ann Rodriguez. (Jurkowitz, Daniel)
April 7, 2020 Filing 52 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 4/2/2020 to Sadie Jo Bingham, Gila County Recorder . (Barton, James)
April 7, 2020 Filing 51 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. (Barton, James)
April 7, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #28 Summons Submitted filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. Defendant name does not match complaint. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 7, 2020 Filing 49 Summons Issued as to Leslie Hoffman, Sharie Miheiro, Robyn Pouquette. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 6, 2020 Filing 48 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections: Affidavit of Process re: Complaint, Summons, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Affidavits, MIDP Notice, Hearing Order upon Sadie Jo Bingham, Gila County Recorder on 04/06/2020. (Barton, James)
April 6, 2020 Filing 47 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Affidavits, MIDP Notice, Hearing Order upon Edison Wauneka, Apache County Recorder on 04/06/2020. (Barton, James)
April 6, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION to Intervene by State of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ensign, Drew)
April 6, 2020 Filing 45 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 4/2/2020 to Richard Garcia, La Paz County Recorder . (Barton, James)
April 6, 2020 Filing 44 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 4/2/2020 to Wendy John, Graham County Recorder. (Barton, James) *Modified text on 4/7/2020 (DXD).
April 6, 2020 Filing 43 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 4/3/2020 to Leslie Hoffman, Yavapai County Recorder . (Barton, James)
April 6, 2020 Filing 42 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 4/3/2020 to Robyn Pouquette, Yuma County Recorder . (Barton, James)
April 6, 2020 Filing 41 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 4/3/2020 to Katie Hobs, Secretary of State . (Barton, James)
April 6, 2020 Filing 40 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 4/3/2020 to Suzie Sainz, Santa Cruz County Recorder . (Barton, James)
April 6, 2020 Filing 39 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 4/3/2020 to Doris Clark, Navajo County Recorder . (Barton, James)
April 6, 2020 Filing 38 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 4/3/2020 to Virginia Ross, Pinal County Recorder . (Barton, James)
April 6, 2020 Filing 37 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 4/3/2020 to David Stevens . (Barton, James)
April 6, 2020 Filing 36 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 4/2/2020 to Sharie Milheiro, Greenlee County Recorder . (Barton, James)
April 6, 2020 Filing 35 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 4/3/2020 to Patty Hansen, Coconino County Recorder . (Barton, James)
April 6, 2020 Filing 34 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 4/2/2020 to Kristi Blair, Mohave County Recorder . (Barton, James)
April 6, 2020 Filing 33 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 4/2/2020 to F. Ann Rodriguez, Pima County Recorder. (Barton, James) *Modified text on 4/7/2020 (DXD).
April 6, 2020 Filing 32 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 4/2/2020 to Adrian Fontes, Maricopa County Recorder. (Barton, James) *Modified text on 4/7/2020 (DXD).
April 6, 2020 Filing 31 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. (Barton, James)
April 6, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. (Barton, James)
April 6, 2020 Filing 29 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. (Barton, James)
April 6, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. (Barton, James)
April 6, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Stanley Moore on behalf of Doris Clark. (Moore, Jason)
April 6, 2020 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to Suzanne Sainz. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 6, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #15 Summons Submitted filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections, #10 Summons Submitted filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections, #23 Summons Submitted filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections, #22 Summons Submitted filed by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. Names on summonses do not match complaint. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 6, 2020 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Sadie Jo Bingham, Kristi Blair, Doris Clark, Richard Garcia, Patty Hansen, Wendy John, Virginia Ross, David Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 4, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. (Barton, James)
April 4, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. (Barton, James)
April 4, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. (Barton, James)
April 4, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. (Barton, James)
April 4, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. (Barton, James)
April 4, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. (Barton, James)
April 4, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. (Barton, James)
April 4, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. (Barton, James)
April 4, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. (Barton, James)
April 4, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. (Barton, James)
April 4, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. (Barton, James)
April 4, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. (Barton, James)
April 4, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. (Barton, James)
April 4, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. (Barton, James)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall serve Defendants with the complaint (Doc. 1), summons, motion for a TRO (Doc. 2), and this Order as soon as practicable, and in any case by April 6, 2020. Plaintiffs shall also file with the Court proof of service of Defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file a Response to Plaintiffs' motion for a TRO (Doc. 2) by April 10, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting a hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for a TRO (Doc. 2) on April 14, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. Due to the Covid-19 pandemic, this will be a telephonic hearing. See D. Ariz. G.O. 20-17 ("To protect the safety and health of all those entering and working in the Courthouse, the Court ORDERS that all proceedings, except those court proceedings deemed necessary by the Court, are continued until further order of the Court.... Individual judges may hold hearings in civil matters as they deem necessary in the safest manner possible. Hearings deemed necessary by the Court will be scheduled and conducted by video teleconference or telephone to the extent possible."). Counsel are directed to call (866) 390-1828; Access Code: 9667260 five minutes before the scheduled hearing. Counsel are advised that speaker phones and cell phones are not permitted [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/3/20. (MAW)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MSA)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18138834. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00658-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MSA)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections (Submitted by James E. Barton II) (MSA)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Randi L. Turk by Plaintiffs Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections, Randi L Turk. (Submitted by James E. Barton II) (MSA)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Jessica Grennan by Plaintiffs Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections, Randi L Turk. (Submitted by James E. Barton II) (MSA)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Anabel Maldonado by Plaintiffs Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections, Randi L Turk. (Submitted by James E. Barton II ) (MSA)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections, Randi L Turk. (Submitted by James E. Barton II) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MSA)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18138834 filed by Randi L Turk, Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare, Arizonans for Fair Elections. (Submitted by James E. Barton II) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MSA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arizonans for Fair Elections et al v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharie Miheiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Blair
Represented By: Jeffrey Blane Haws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Stevens
Represented By: Britt Wesley Hanson
Represented By: Christine Joyce Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Hansen
Represented By: Rose Marie Winkeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F Ann Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel S Jurkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Ross
Represented By: Craig Charles Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Hobbs
Represented By: Roy Herrera, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Abraham Arellano
Represented By: Jillian Laura Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doris Clark
Represented By: Jason Stanley Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Garcia
Represented By: Ryan Norton Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edison Wauneka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Fontes
Represented By: Joseph James Branco
Represented By: Joseph Eugene LaRue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sadie Jo Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn Pouquette
Represented By: William J Kerekes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Sainz
Represented By: Kimberly Janiece Hunley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizonans for Fair Elections
Represented By: Israel G Torres
Represented By: James Evans Barton, II
Represented By: Jacqueline Mendez Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randi L Turk
Represented By: Israel G Torres
Represented By: James Evans Barton, II
Represented By: Jacqueline Mendez Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizonans Fed up with Failing Healthcare
Represented By: Israel G Torres
Represented By: James Evans Barton, II
Represented By: Jacqueline Mendez Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Arizona Free Enterprise Club
Represented By: Timothy Andrew LaSota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Arizona Republican Party
Represented By: John Douglas Wilenchik
Represented By: Dennis Ira Wilenchik
Represented By: Lee Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Goldwater Institute
Represented By: Timothy Mason Sandefur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Arizona, State of
Represented By: Robert John Makar
Represented By: Drew Curtis Ensign
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: President of the Arizona Senate
Represented By: David Aaron Brown
Represented By: David J Cantelme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Speaker of the Arizona House of Representatives
Represented By: David Aaron Brown
Represented By: David J Cantelme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?