Columbia River Mining Supplies LLC v. Colter Young Consulting & Design et al
Plaintiff: Columbia River Mining Supplies LLC
Defendant: Colter Young Consulting & Design, Colter Young Consulting LLC, Unknown Young and Colter Young
Case Number: 2:2020cv00672
Filed: April 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #20 MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case to District of Idaho filed by Columbia River Mining Supplies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Matthew L. Bycer)(Bycer, Matthew)
May 13, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case to District of Idaho by Colter Young Consulting & Design, Colter Young Consulting LLC, Colter Young. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Colter Young)(Swanson, Scott)
May 7, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Columbia River Mining Supplies LLC. (Bycer, Matthew)
May 7, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re: #9 MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case to District of Idaho filed by Columbia River Mining Supplies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Urick, #2 Declaration of Matthew L. Bycer)(Bycer, Matthew)
May 4, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Colter Young Consulting & Design, Colter Young Consulting LLC, Colter Young. (Swanson, Scott)
April 30, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #14 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header (REK)
April 30, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Colter Young Consulting & Design and Colter Young Consulting LLC. (MAW)
April 29, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Colter Young Consulting & Design, Colter Young Consulting LLC, Colter Young filed by Columbia River Mining Supplies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bycer, Matthew)
April 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Columbia River Mining Supplies LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bycer, Matthew)
April 29, 2020 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Columbia River Mining Supplies LLC: Certificate of Service re: Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint for Patent Infringement -Demand for Jury Trial, Notice to Parties - Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, General Order, and Checklist upon Colter Young Consulting LLC on 04/08/2020. (Bycer, Matthew)
April 29, 2020 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Columbia River Mining Supplies LLC: Certificate of Service re: Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint for Patent Infringement -Demand for Jury Trial, Notice to Parties - Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, General Order, and Checklist upon Colter Young Consulting & Design on 04/08/2020. (Bycer, Matthew)
April 29, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Columbia River Mining Supplies LLC: Certificate of Service re: Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint for Patent Infringement -Demand for Jury Trial, Notice to Parties - Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, General Order, and Checklist upon Colter Young on 04/08/2020. (Bycer, Matthew)
April 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case to District of Idaho by Colter Young Consulting & Design, Colter Young Consulting LLC, Colter Young. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Colter Young)(Swanson, Scott)
April 22, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Scott D Swanson on behalf of Defendants Colter Young Consulting & Design, Colter Young Consulting LLC, and Colter Young. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Colter Young Consulting & Design, Colter Young Consulting LLC, Colter Young. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MSA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Columbia River Mining Supplies LLC. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MSA)
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 097018142807. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00672-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MSA)
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Columbia River Mining Supplies LLC. (Submitted by Matthew Bycer) (MSA)
April 3, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Columbia River Mining Supplies LLC. (Submitted by Matthew Bycer) (MSA)
April 3, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted. (Submitted by Matthew L. Bycer) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MSA)
April 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18142807 filed by Columbia River Mining Supplies LLC. (Submitted by Matthew L. Bycer) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(MSA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Columbia River Mining Supplies LLC v. Colter Young Consulting & Design et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia River Mining Supplies LLC
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Bycer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colter Young Consulting & Design
Represented By: Scott D Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colter Young Consulting LLC
Represented By: Scott D Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colter Young
Represented By: Scott D Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?