Haire v. Liberty Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Brian Haire
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv00686
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Referring Judge: Michael T Morrissey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Stafford, Karen)
May 5, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Stafford, Karen)
May 1, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Dominic W Lanza. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-686-PHX-DWL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 30, 2020 Filing 11 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Brian Haire. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plt's MIDP response ltr)(Christoffel, David)
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 *MOTION to Remand to State Court, MOTION for Attorney Fees by Brian Haire. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Christoffel, David). *Added MOTION for Attorney Fees on 4/22/2020 (EJA).
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Liberty Insurance Corporation.(Stafford, Karen)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18152836. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Morrissey. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-686-PHX-MTM. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (DLC)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Stafford, Karen) (DLC)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-002538. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18152836 filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Stafford, Karen) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-D, #4 Notice to Plaintiff)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haire v. Liberty Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Cassandra Victoria Meyer
Represented By: Karen Christine Stafford
Represented By: Victoria Renee Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Haire
Represented By: David Andrew Christoffel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?