Gonzalez v. US Human Rights Network et al
Plaintiff: Rosalee Gonzalez
Defendant: Marcia Johnson-Blanco, Lisa Crooms-Robins, Monami Maulik, Eric Tars and US Human Rights Network
Counter Defendant: Unknown Party
Case Number: 2:2020cv00757
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED as follows: The parties are directed to confer and develop a Rule 26(f) Joint Case Management Report, which must be filed no later than August 7, 2020 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 6/12/20. (MAW)
June 12, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #12 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Defendant's Counterclaims by Rosalee Gonzalez, Rosalee Gonzalez.(Francis, Carrie)
June 12, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims Counterclaims by Rosalee Gonzalez, Rosalee Gonzalez. (Francis, Carrie)
June 3, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Lisa Crooms-Robins, Marcia Johnson-Blanco, Monami Maulik, Eric Tars. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 2, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Submitted by Rosalee Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Summons Crooms-Robins, #2 Summons Tars, #3 Summons Johnson-Blanco)(Francis, Carrie)
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by US Human Rights Network.(Leonhardt, Shanks)
May 8, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants filed by Rosalee Gonzalez.(Francis, Carrie)
May 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Rosalee Gonzalez . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Francis, Carrie)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant U.S. Human Rights Network, Inc.'s unopposed motion for extension of time (Doc. #8 ) is granted. The deadline for U.S. Human Rights Network, Inc. to respond to the complaint is extended to May 11, 2020. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/24/20. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 5 Order, Set Deadlines (Unopposed) and Notice re Court's April 23, 2020 Order by US Human Rights Network. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Leonhardt, Shanks)
April 23, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by US Human Rights Network. (Leonhardt, Shanks)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on July 21, 2020, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/23/20. (MAW)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Defendant U.S. Human Rights Network, Inc. removed this case on April 20, 2020. (Doc. 1) The Notice of Removal asserts that, due to waiving service in the state court action, U.S. Human Rights Network, Inc.'s response is due June 1, 2020. (Id. at 2.) No authority is cited for the proposition that waiver of service in a state court action alters the response deadline established by Rule 81(c)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that U.S. Human Rights Network, Inc. shall file a memorandum, not to exceed two pages, by April 24, 2020, either (1) providing support for this proposition, or (2) conceding that the response deadline is established by Rule 81(c)(2). Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/22/20. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18195077. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-757-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
April 20, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by US Human Rights Network. (Leonhardt, Shanks) (ARC)
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-003741. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18195077 filed by US Human Rights Network.(Leonhardt, Shanks) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(ARC)
April 20, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Acceptance of Service re: Summons upon US Human Rights Network on 4/3/2020. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 4/3/2020) (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. US Human Rights Network et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Johnson-Blanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Crooms-Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monami Maulik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Tars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Human Rights Network
Represented By: Amanda M Breemes
Represented By: Robin Elyce Burgess
Represented By: Shanks Leonhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalee Gonzalez
Represented By: Timothy Sean Lauxman
Represented By: Carrie Marie Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?