Little v. Grand Canyon University
Plaintiff: Carson Little
Defendant: Grand Canyon University
Case Number: 2:2020cv00795
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting the #13 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. It is hereby ORDERED that the law firm of Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP (Sean P. Healy, Jon P. Kardassakis, and Kathryn Honecker) is substituted as counsel of record for Defendant Grand Canyon University in place of Snell & Wilmer, L.L.P. (Jennifer Hadley Catero and Adam Lang) for all further purposes in this matter. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/17/2020. (ESG)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #14 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Request for Judicial Notice by Defendant Grand Canyon University. (Healy, Sean)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Grand Canyon University. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit /Declaration of Kathryn Honecker, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Healy, Sean)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 First MOTION to Substitute Attorney (Application & Consent) by Grand Canyon University. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healy, Sean)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER the #11 Stipulation is GRANTED. Defendant Grand Canyon University shall have through and including June 17, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Original Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 5/14/2020. (ESG)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (Joint) by Grand Canyon University. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Catero, Jennifer)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Hadley Catero on behalf of Grand Canyon University. (Catero, Jennifer)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Matthew S Miller on behalf of Plaintiff Carson Little. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Adam J Levitt, Amy E Keller, Laura E Reasons on behalf of Plaintiff Carson Little. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Carson Little: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Order Re: Motions to Dismiss upon Grand Canyon University on April 27, 2020. (Ryan, Robert)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 7/23/2020. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 4/24/2020. (ESG)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 4/24/2020. (ESG)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 4/24/2020. (ESG)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Grand Canyon University. (WLP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (WLP)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18214188. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00795-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (WLP)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Carson Little. (Ryan, Robert) (WLP)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18214188 filed by Carson Little. (Ryan, Robert) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(WLP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little v. Grand Canyon University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carson Little
Represented By: Laura E Reasons
Represented By: Matthew S Miller
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Represented By: Robert David Ryan
Represented By: Amy E Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Canyon University
Represented By: Jennifer Hadley Catero
Represented By: Sean Patrick Healy
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Honecker
Represented By: Jon Peter Kardassakis
Represented By: Adam Elliott Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?