Arizona Recovery Housing Association v. Arizona Department of Health Services et al
Plaintiff: Arizona Recovery Housing Association
Defendant: Arizona Department of Health Services and Cara Christ
Case Number: 2:2020cv00893
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference presently set for 7/22/2020, is RESET for Wednesday, 8/5/2020 at 01:30 PM, in Courtroom 503, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge James A. Teilborg. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 7/22/2020 at 11:00 AM, in Courtroom 503. Counsel shall jointly file their Proposed Case Management Plan with the Clerk of the Court not less than ten (10) days before the Scheduling Conference. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 6/2/2020. (RMW)
May 29, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Arizona Department of Health Services, Cara Christ.(LaMagna, Patricia)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that Plaintiff Arizona Recovery Housing Association's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #11 ) is DENIED. See attached order for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 5/27/2020. (RMW)
May 21, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Arizona Recovery Housing Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Spencer, Eric)
May 21, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Patricia Cracchiolo LaMagna. (LaMagna, Patricia)
May 20, 2020 Filing 16 * RESPONSE in Opposition re: #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #14 Supplement to MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Arizona Department of Health Services, Cara Christ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bower Declaration, #2 Exhibit Sober Living Home Licensure Economic Impact Statement, #3 Exhibit Letter from Sen. Brophy McGee)(Corcoran, Aubrey) * Modified to correct text and linkage regarding #14 on 5/21/2020 (LAD).
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED Defendants shall respond to the Motion for TRO (Doc. #11 ) by May 20, 2020. Plaintiff shall reply by May 21, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Clerk of the Court shall re-docket Doc. #14 as a supplement to Doc. #11 , rather than a motion. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/15/2020. (LAD)
May 15, 2020 Filing 14 * SUPPLEMENT TO #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Arizona Recovery Housing Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Spencer, Eric) * Modified to reflect document is a Supplement pursuant to #15 Order on 5/15/2020 (LAD).
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Patricia C. LaMagna appearing for Arizona Department of Health Services, Cara Christ. . (LaMagna, Patricia)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (text only): The Court has reviewed the motion for TRO (Doc. #11 ) and notes it is sought with notice to Defendants; accordingly, the Court must give Defendants an opportunity to be heard. In the Court's quick review of the motion, the Court did not locate a date certain by which a particular harm would impact Plaintiff. Therefore, IT IS ORDERED that by noon TODAY, Plaintiff must file a supplement to the motion for TRO indicating a date certain by which injunctive relief is requested, and explaining the significance of this date. The supplemental brief may not exceed two pages. If Plaintiff fails to provide a date certain as required by this Order, such failure will weigh against granting injunctive relief. Ordered by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 5/15/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Arizona Recovery Housing Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Spencer, Eric)
May 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Eric Harmon Spencer. (Spencer, Eric)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction (Doc. #8 ) is denied without prejudice. (See attached order for additional information.) Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 5/14/2020. (RMW)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Arizona Recovery Housing Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Spencer, Eric)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Arizona Recovery Housing Association.(Spencer, Eric)
May 8, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Steven G Polin on behalf of Plaintiff Arizona Recovery Housing Association. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDARD CIVIL TRACK INITIAL ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff must file a notice within 7 days of any Defendant answering (or, in a removed case, within 7 days of removal if any Defendant answered prior to removal) that the parties are ready for a Rule 16 scheduling conference. The Court will issue an order setting a Rule 16 conference. THE PARTIES ARE CAUTIONED that it is the practice of this Court to not extend the Dispositive Motion Deadline beyond the two-year anniversary of the case being filed in or removed to Federal Court, nor to allow the Discovery Cut-Off to extend beyond 30 days before the Dispositive Motion Deadline. THE PARTIES ARE FURTHER CAUTIONED that, pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 7.2(i), their failure to serve and file the required responsive memorandum to a motion "may be deemed a consent to the... granting of the motion and the Court may dispose of the motion summarily." (See document for further information). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/8/2020. (LAD)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Arizona Department of Health Services, Cara Christ. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18260447. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A. Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00893-PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arizona Recovery Housing Association. (submitted by Ryan Regula) (REK)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizona Recovery Housing Association. (submitted by Ryan Regula) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(REK)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18260447 filed by Arizona Recovery Housing Association. (submitted by Ryan Regula) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arizona Recovery Housing Association v. Arizona Department of Health Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Recovery Housing Association
Represented By: Steven G Polin
Represented By: Ryan James Regula
Represented By: Heather Dukes
Represented By: Eric Harmon Spencer
Represented By: Colin Patrick Ahler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Health Services
Represented By: Patricia Cracchiolo LaMagna
Represented By: Aubrey Joy Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cara Christ
Represented By: Patricia Cracchiolo LaMagna
Represented By: Aubrey Joy Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?