Engleka v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Frances Engleka
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv00925
Filed: May 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic Trial Scheduling Conference set for 5/18/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to be prepared to discuss the following: (1) whether there are any outstanding motions, and (2) a trial date. If there are any outstanding motions, the parties are directed to re-file them. Additionally, the parties will be provided with call-in information via separate email. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
May 14, 2020 Filing 31 Letter: Transfer of 2:13-cv-32018 from the Southern District of West Virginia to the District of Arizona. New Case Number: CV-20-925-PHX-DLR. (MAP)
May 14, 2020 Filing 30 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-32018 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
May 11, 2020 Filing 29 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 161 - BSC PTO-11 - Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit ECF 184 - BSC PTO-13 - Stipulation for the Production of Docs and Electronically Stored Info, #3 Exhibit ECF 196 - BSC PTO-14 - New Direct Filing Order, Master Complaint, SF Complaint, #4 Exhibit ECF 197 - Master Long Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit ECF 200 - BSC_s Master Answer to Master Long Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit ECF 4955 - BSC PTO-175 - Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 4 Cases, #7 Exhibit ECF 4987 - BSC PTO-176 (Notice of Correction of Error in PTO-175 - Wave 4), #8 Exhibit ECF 6100 - BSC PTO-187 - Amended Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 4, #9 Exhibit ECF 4826 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo in Support of MTE Badylak, #10 Exhibit ECF 4976 - BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #11 Exhibit ECF 5033 - Pltf_s Reply to Dft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #12 Exhibit ECF 6984 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Badylak, #13 Exhibit ECF 7067 - Boston Scientific's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Dr. S. Badylak, #14 Exhibit ECF 6041 - Memo Opinion and Order Badylak, #15 Exhibit ECF 1013 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo in Support of MTE Culligan, #16 Exhibit ECF 6985 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Culligan, #17 Exhibit ECF 7060 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Culligan, #18 Exhibit ECF 7158 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply Culligan, #19 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo in Support of MTE Little, #20 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo in Support of MTE Little - Exhibit 1, #21 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo in Support of MTE Little - Exhibit 2, #22 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo in Support of MTE Little - Exhibit 3, #23 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo in Support of MTE Little - Exhibit 4, #24 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo in Support of MTE Little - Exhibit 5, #25 Exhibit ECF 4979 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Little, #26 Exhibit ECF 5034 - Pltf_s Reply to Dft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Little, #27 Exhibit ECF 6995 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Little, #28 Exhibit ECF 7066 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Little, #29 Exhibit ECF 6044 - Memo Opinion and Order Little, #30 Exhibit ECF 4833 - Pltf_s MTE Rosenblatt and Memo in Support, #31 Exhibit ECF 4978 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Rosenblatt, #32 Exhibit ECF 5039 - Pltf_s Reply Brief in Support of MTE Rosenblatt, #33 Exhibit ECF 6047 - Memorandum Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Dr. P. Rosenblatt, #34 Exhibit ECF 6986 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Rosenblatt, #35 Exhibit ECF 7061 -BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Rosenblatt, #36 Exhibit ECF 7004 - Plaintiffs' Combined Motion and Memorandum to MTE re Spiegelberg, #37 Exhibit ECF 7088 - BSC's Response in Opp to Plaintiff's Combined MTE re Spiegelberg, #38 Exhibit ECF 7160 - Plaintiff's Reply in Support of MTE re Spiegelberg, #39 Exhibit ECF 7011 - BSC's MTE General Causation Testimony of Dr. B. Rosenzweig, #40 Exhibit ECF 7037 - Plaintiff's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Rosenzweig, #41 Exhibit ECF 7085 - Pltf's Response to BSC's MTE General Causation Testimony of Rosenzweig, #42 Exhibit ECF 7175 - BSC's Reply ISO MTE General Causation Testimony of Rosenzweig, #43 Exhibit ECF 7002 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE re Dr. J. Blaivas, #44 Exhibit ECF 4822 - BSC'S MTE Blaivas, #45 Exhibit ECF 7028 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Daubert Response re Blaivas, #46 Exhibit ECF 7042 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Daubert Response re Blaivas, #47 Exhibit ECF 4962 - Plaintiffs' Opp to BSC's MTE re Blaivas, #48 Exhibit ECF 3029 - Memorandum Opinion and Order re Blaivas, #49 Exhibit ECF 7013 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Shull, #50 Exhibit ECF 4810 - BSC's MTE Shull and Memorandum, #51 Exhibit ECF 7038 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Shull., #52 Exhibit ECF 7044 - Plantiff's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Shull, #53 Exhibit ECF 4966 - Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's MTE Shull, #54 Exhibit ECF 6048 - Memorandum Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Dr. B. Shull, #55 Exhibit ECF 7015 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Dr. V. Iakovlev, #56 Exhibit ECF 4819 - Boston Scientific's MTE Iakovlev, #57 Exhibit ECF 7050 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Daubert Response re Iakovlev, #58 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Plaintiffs' Response to BSC's MTE re Iakovlev, #59 Exhibit ECF 6033 - Memorandum Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Iakovlev, #60 Exhibit ECF 7009 - BSCs Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Guelcher, #61 Exhibit ECF 7030 - Pltf's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Guelcher, #62 Exhibit ECF 7057 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Guelcher, #63 Exhibit ECF 7166 - BSCs Notice of Adoption of BSC's Prior Reply MTE Guelcher, #64 Exhibit ECF 7010 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Mays, #65 Exhibit ECF 4805 - BSC's MOL ISO MTE Mays, #66 Exhibit ECF 7033 - Plaintiff's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Mays, #67 Exhibit ECF 7065 - Plaintiff's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Mays, #68 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Plaintiffs' Memo in Opp MTE Mays, #69 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Plaintiffs' Memo in Opp MTE Mays - Exhibit 1, #70 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Plaintiffs' Memo in Opp MTE Mays - Exhibit 2, #71 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Plaintiffs' Memo in Opp MTE Mays - Exhibit 3, #72 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Plaintiffs' Memo in Opp MTE Mays - Exhibit 4, #73 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Plaintiffs' Memo in Opp MTE Mays - Exhibit 5, #74 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Plaintiffs' Memo in Opp MTE Mays - Exhibit 6, #75 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Plaintiffs' Memo in Opp MTE Mays - Exhibit 7, #76 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Plaintiffs' Memo in Opp MTE Mays - Exhibit 8, #77 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Plaintiffs' Memo in Opp MTE Mays - Exhibit 9, #78 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Plaintiffs' Memo in Opp MTE Mays - Exhibit 10, #79 Exhibit ECF 6036 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert re Mays, #80 Exhibit ECF 7007 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE re Dunn, #81 Exhibit ECF 7058 - Pltfs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Dunn, #82 Exhibit ECF 7165 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Reply re MTE Dunn, #83 Exhibit ECF 7012 - BSCs Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Veronikis, #84 Exhibit ECF 4807 - BSCs MTE Veronikis and Memo., #85 Exhibit ECF 7039 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert re Veronikis, #86 Exhibit ECF 7045 - Pltf' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert re Veronikis, #87 Exhibit ECF 4964 - Plaintiffs' Response and Memo in Opp to MTE Veronikis, #88 Exhibit ECF 6051 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Veronikis, #89 Exhibit ECF 7017 - BSCs Notice of Adoption of Prior MTE Margolis, #90 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC's MTE Margolis and Memo, #91 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC's MTE Margolis and Memo - Exhibit A, #92 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC's MTE Margolis and Memo - Exhibit B, #93 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC's MTE Margolis and Memo - Exhibit C, #94 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC's MTE Margolis and Memo - Exhibit D, #95 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC's MTE Margolis and Memo - Exhibit E, #96 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC's MTE Margolis and Memo - Exhibit F, #97 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC's MTE Margolis and Memo - Exhibit G, #98 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC's MTE Margolis and Memo - Exhibit H, #99 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC's MTE Margolis and Memo - Exhibit I, #100 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC's MTE Margolis and Memo - Exhibit J, #101 Exhibit ECF 7032 - Pltfs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Margolis, #102 Exhibit ECF 7046 - Pltfs' Notice of Adoption of Response re Margolis, #103 Exhibit ECF 4960 - Response by Pltfs to BSCs MTE Margolis, #104 Exhibit ECF 6035 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Margolis, #105 Exhibit ECF 7016 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior MTE Ostergard, #106 Exhibit ECF 4821 - BSC's MTE Ostergard, #107 Exhibit ECF 4961 - Pltfs' Response to Def's MTE Ostergard, #108 Exhibit ECF 7035 - PLTFS' Notice of Adoption of Prior Response re Ostergard, #109 Exhibit ECF 7051 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Response re Ostergard, #110 Exhibit ECF 6037 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert re Ostergard, #111 Exhibit ECF 7008 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Galloway, #112 Exhibit ECF 4818 - BSC's MTE Galloway and Memorandum ISO, #113 Exhibit ECF 7048 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Response re Galloway, #114 Exhibit ECF 4958 - Pltfs' Opp to MTE Galloway, #115 Exhibit ECF 6031 - Memorandum Opinion and Order re Galloway, #116 Exhibit ECF 7005 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior MTE Trepeta, #117 Exhibit ECF 4811 - BSC's MTE Trepeta and Memo, #118 Exhibit ECF 7049 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Response re Trepeta, #119 Exhibit ECF 4963 - Plaintiffs' Response in Opp to BSC's MTE Trepeta, #120 Exhibit ECF 6050 - Memorandum Opinion and Order re Trepeta, #121 Exhibit ECF 7018 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Pence, #122 Exhibit ECF 4815 - BSC's MTE Pence and Memorandum ISO, #123 Exhibit ECF 7036 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Pence, #124 Exhibit ECF 7047 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Dr. P. Pence, #125 Exhibit ECF 4968 - Plaintiffs' Response in Opp to MTE Pence, #126 Exhibit ECF 5038 - Boston Scientific's Reply Memorandum ISO MTE Pence, #127 Exhibit ECF 6038 - Memorandum Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Dr. P. Pence, #128 Exhibit ECF 2890 - Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendant's MTE Veronikis, #129 Exhibit ECF 2950 - Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' MTE Ostergard, #130 Exhibit ECF 2949 - Plaintiffs' Mem in Opposition to Defendant's MTE Pence, #131 Exhibit ECF 3758 - Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Memo ISO MTE Blaivas, #132 Exhibit ECF 3751 - Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Exclude Dr. J. Mays, #133 Exhibit ECF 4675 - Plaintiffs' Memo in Opposition to Defendant's MTE Guelcher, #134 Exhibit ECF 5482 - Plaintiffs' Memo in Opposition to Defendant's MTE Rosenzweig, #135 Exhibit ECF 2169 - Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defend
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 5/12/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 5/11/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/28/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mms) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF FRIENDS AND FAMILY by Boston Scientific Corporation of all friends and family members identified in the Plaintiff Fact Sheet, including section VI. Fact Witnesses, and/or identified during the Plaintiffs deposition including but not limited to Lloyd Kissick on a date and at a time to be determined. (Keale, James) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPE DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. on October 17, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (CST) (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Rule 26 Designation and Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 24 THIRD AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Frances Engleka of Dr. Anoop Sharma on 09/07/2018 at 8:00 a.m. MST/11:00 a.m. EDT (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 23 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Frances Engleka of Dr. Anoop Sharma on 08/24/2018 at 7:00 AM MST/10:00 AM EDT (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frances Engleka for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frances Engleka for Objections and Responses to Defendant's Interrogatories and Requests for Production. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRETRIAL ORDER # 187 (Amended Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 175. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 4 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases) (brn) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frances Engleka for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Interrogatories and Request for Production. (Keale, James) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frances Engleka for Interrogatories, Request for Admissions, Request for Production of Documents. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Sheila Carmody on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Carmody, Sheila) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 15 CROSS-NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Frances Engleka of Frances Engleka on 5/17/2018 at 11:00 a.m. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Frances Engleka on May 17, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
April 13, 2018 Filing 13 PLAINTIFFS AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Frances Engleka of Dr. Anoop Sharma on 05/17/2018 at 5:00 p.m. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
April 11, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael A. Tanenbaum on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frances Engleka for Plaintiff Fact Sheet. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Frances Engleka of Dr. Anoop Sharma on 04/12/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
June 21, 2017 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Frances Engleka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
January 19, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
February 5, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
January 29, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jeffrey L. Haberman on behalf of Frances Engleka. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
January 2, 2014 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Boston Scientific Corporation, re: #2 Electronic Summons Issued,. Boston Scientific Corporation served on 12/20/2013, answer due 1/10/2014. (Patrick, Charles) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
December 16, 2013 Filing 3 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 64 (Motion to Establish Order of Discovery and Request for In-Person Hearing) entered on 12/13/2013 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (klc) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
December 13, 2013 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boston Scientific Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mmw) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
December 12, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2840141. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mmw) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Engleka v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Jon A Strongman
Represented By: Sheila K Carmody
Represented By: Michael A Tanenbaum
Represented By: Eric M Anielak
Represented By: James H Keale
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Engleka
Represented By: Jeffrey L Haberman
Represented By: Charles Bland Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?