Panda Accounting LLC v. Academy Bank NA et al
Plaintiff: Panda Accounting LLC
Defendant: MidFirst Bank, JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, Academy Bank NA, JP Morgan Chase Bank NA doing business as Chase Bank and JPMorgan Chase Bank NA doing business as Chase Bank
Case Number: 2:2020cv00985
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss Party Academy Bank, NA filed by Panda Accounting LLC. (Gudmundson, Brian)
July 16, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Amend/Correct (Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint) by Panda Accounting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redline Version of Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gudmundson, Brian)
June 19, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michael E Adler on behalf of Plaintiff Panda Accounting LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 18, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MidFirst Bank identifying Corporate Parent Midland Financial Co. for MidFirst Bank. (Doran, John)
June 17, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Academy Bank NA identifying Corporate Parent Dickinson Financial Corporation for Academy Bank NA. (Allen, Jennifer)
June 17, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Academy Bank NA and MidFirst Bank. (LFIG)
June 16, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Party Academy Bank, NA by Academy Bank NA. (Allen, Jennifer)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting the #15 Motion. Defendant MidFirst Bank shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint within 21 days of a ruling on the Motion to Transfer currently pending before the U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Case No. 2950, under which this case is associated. ORDERED that within five (5) days of the Panel's ruling on the pending Motion to Transfer, the parties shall file a Notice of Ruling with this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/18/2020. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/16/2020. (LFIG)
June 16, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Joint Stipulated Motion to Extend MidFirst Bank's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (First Request) by MidFirst Bank. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doran, John)
June 15, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for James R McGuire, Lauren Lynn Erker, Michael Aaron Rome on behalf of Defendant MidFirst Bank. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 terminating #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Pro hac vice motion incorrectly filed into civil case; attorney notified to refile in pro hac master case and pay $100 filing fee. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney James R. McGuire by MidFirst Bank. (McGuire, James)
June 11, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE re: Service of Court's Orders on Defendants by Panda Accounting LLC re: #6 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions, #8 Order, Set/Reset Hearings . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Robinovitch, Hart)
June 11, 2020 Remark: Out of state attorneys Michael E Adler, Michael S Popok, and Mitchell G Mandell removed as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John Alan Doran on behalf of MidFirst Bank. (Doran, John)
June 8, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Harmeet K Dhillon and Nitoj P Singh on behalf of Plaintiff Panda Accounting LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Panda Accounting LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint Package upon Academy Bank, N.A. on 5/26/2020. (Robinovitch, Hart)
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Panda Accounting LLC: Acceptance of Service re: Complaint Package upon MidFirst Bank on 05/28/2020. (Robinovitch, Hart)
June 1, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michael J Laird on behalf of Plaintiff Panda Accounting LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 29, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Benjamin Meiselas on behalf of Plaintiff Panda Accounting LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 29, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Mark John Geragos on behalf of Plaintiff Panda Accounting LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 28, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Brian C Gudmundson on behalf of Plaintiff Panda Accounting LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 8/18/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/27/2020. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Panda Accounting LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint Package upon JP Morgan Chase, N.A. d/b/a Chase Bank on 05/22/2020. (Robinovitch, Hart)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/20/2020. (LFIG)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Academy Bank NA, JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, MidFirst Bank. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18297852. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00985-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Panda Accounting LLC. (Robinovitch, Hart) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Panda Accounting LLC. (BAC)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18297852 filed by Panda Accounting LLC. (Robinovitch, Hart) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Panda Accounting LLC v. Academy Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MidFirst Bank
Represented By: Michael Aaron Rome
Represented By: Craig Alan Morgan
Represented By: James R McGuire
Represented By: Lauren Lynn Erker
Represented By: John Alan Doran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Academy Bank NA
Represented By: Jennifer Linda Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank NA doing business as Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA doing business as Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Panda Accounting LLC
Represented By: Hart Lawrence Robinovitch
Represented By: Mark John Geragos
Represented By: Benjamin Meiselas
Represented By: Brian C Gudmundson
Represented By: Michael E Adler
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Nitoj P Singh
Represented By: Michael J Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?