Smith v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kristine Marie Smith
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00992
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Kristine Marie Smith. (Lamb, Ryan)
June 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Reynolds, Echo)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Settlement Conference set for 1/20/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 302, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 6/22/20. (GMP)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: This case is referred by random lot to United States Magistrate Judge John Z. Boyle for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference. The parties shall contact the chambers of the Honorable John Z. Boyle no later than June 25, 2020 to schedule a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/18/2020. (LMR)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 2/12/2021. Dispositive motions due by 7/29/2021. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/18/2020. (LMR)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Rule 16 Case Management Conference, presently set for June 26, 2020 before Honorable Steven P. Logan, is vacated. Order to follow. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/18/2020. (LMR)
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reynolds, Echo)
June 9, 2020 Filing 10 *NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Ryan Anthony Lamb terminating Marc Andrew Kamin and Ellen Elizabeth Stark. (Lamb, Ryan) *Modified to correct event and terminate attorneys on 6/10/2020 (GMP).
June 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 Demand for Jury Trial by Plaintiff filed by Kristine Marie Smith. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMP)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Kristine Marie Smith. (Lamb, Ryan)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference is set for 6/26/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(LMR)
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Reynolds, Echo)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE re: Notice of Service by USAA Casualty Insurance Company re: #4 Order . (Reynolds, Echo)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY ORDER (See attachment for details). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/21/2020. (CLB)
May 21, 2020 ***State Court record received on 5/21/2020***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Kristine Marie Smith: Notice of Service of Process re: Summons and Complaint upon USAA Casualty Insurance Company via AZ Department of Insurance on 4/23/2020.***Filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on unknown date, docketed in U.S. District Court, District of Arizona on 5/21/2020 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18305530. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P. Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00992-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAA Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent United Services Automobile Association for USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (submitted by Echo Reynolds) (REK)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-052518. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18305530 filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (submitted by Echo Reynolds) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Marie Smith
Represented By: Ellen Elizabeth Stark
Represented By: Marc Andrew Kamin
Represented By: Ryan Anthony Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Echo Adrien Reynolds
Represented By: Nathan David Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?