Chandler Therapy Clinic et al v. CIGNA Healthcare of Arizona
Plaintiff: Christopher Komarnisky and Chandler Therapy Clinic
Defendant: CIGNA Healthcare of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2020cv01041
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's Order filed on July 6, 2020 (Doc. 17 in CV-20-01034-PHX-DJH), Chandler Therapy Clinic terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Consolidate (Doc. 13 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Chandler Therapy Clinic has until July 10, 2020, in which to obtain counsel. If Chandler Therapy Clinic does not obtain counsel by that date, the Clerk of the Court respectfully is directed to dismiss Chandler Therapy Clinic from all consolidated cases, which it remains a party in, without further order of the Court. Cases: 2:20-cv-01034-DJH, 2:20-cv-01041-DWL, 2:20-cv-01042-DLR, 2:20-cv-01044-DJH, 2:20-cv-01045-DLR, 2:20-cv-01110-DLR consolidated. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/2/2020. See document for complete details. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-01034-DJH et al.. (WLP)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court has reviewed Defendant's memorandum opposing remand. (Doc. #8 .) The evidence enclosed with the memorandum, although somewhat ambiguous, suggests that Plaintiffs received an assignment of benefits from K.A. (Doc. 8-1 at 3 10-1; Doc. 8-1 at 71.) Assuming such an assignment occurred, Plaintiffs would possess standing and it would be unnecessary to sua sponte remand this action to state court based on a lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Thus, the Court will take no action at the present time and will await a ruling by Judge Humetewa on the pending motion to transfer. (Doc. #7 .) This determination is without prejudice to the transferee judge further inquiring into the existence of standing. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 6/17/20. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM Opposing Remand by Defendant CIGNA Healthcare of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(West, John)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Transfer Related Case by CIGNA Healthcare of Arizona, CIGNA Healthcare of Arizona Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-20-1034-PHX-DJH, CV-20-1041-PHX-DWL, CV-20-1042-PHX-DLR, CV-20-1044-PHX-DJH, CV-20-1045-PHX-DLR, CV-20-1110-PHX-DLR) (West, John)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) by CIGNA Healthcare of Arizona.(West, John)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Cigna must, by June 16, 2020, (1) voluntarily remand this action, or (2) file a memorandum, not to exceed five pages, showing cause why this action should not be remanded for lack of Article III jurisdiction due to the plaintiffs' lack of standing. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall remand this action to the Maricopa County Justice Courts, without further notice, if Cigna does not comply with this order [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 6/2/20. (MAW)
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (EJA)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18326019. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01041-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (EJA)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CIGNA Healthcare of Arizona identifying Corporate Parent CIGNA Corporation for CIGNA Healthcare of Arizona.(John C West) (EJA)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CC2020-071120SC. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18326019 filed by CIGNA Healthcare of Arizona.(John C West) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(EJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chandler Therapy Clinic et al v. CIGNA Healthcare of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Komarnisky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandler Therapy Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA Healthcare of Arizona
Represented By: John C West
Represented By: Jennifer Soo Jung Lee-Cota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?