Chandler Therapy Clinic et al v. CIGNA Healthcare of Arizona Incorporated
Plaintiff: Christopher Komarnisky and Chandler Therapy Clinic
Defendant: CIGNA Healthcare of Arizona Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2020cv01045
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's Order filed on July 6, 2020 (Doc. 17 in CV-20-01034-PHX-DJH), Chandler Therapy Clinic is hereby terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference scheduled for 7/28/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Douglas Rayes is VACATED. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/6/2020. (MMO)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Consolidate (Doc. #13 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Chandler Therapy Clinic has until July 10, 2020, in which to obtain counsel. If Chandler Therapy Clinic does not obtain counsel by that date, the Clerk of the Court respectfully is directed to dismiss Chandler Therapy Clinic from all consolidated cases, which it remains a party in, without further order of the Court. Cases: 2:20-cv-01034-DJH, 2:20-cv-01041-DWL, 2:20-cv-01042-DLR, 2:20-cv-01044-DJH, 2:20-cv-01045-DLR, 2:20-cv-01110-DLR consolidated. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/2/2020. See document for complete details. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-01034-DJH et al.. (WLP)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that Chandler Therapy Clinic has until July 3, 2020 in which to obtain counsel. If Chandler Therapy Clinic does not obtain counsel by that date, the Clerk of the Court is directed to dismiss only Chandler Therapy Clinic without further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/23/2020. (MMO)
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE re parties by Christopher Komarnisky re: #7 Order. (REK)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Transfer Related Case by CIGNA Healthcare of Arizona, CIGNA Healthcare of Arizona Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-20-1034-PHX-DJH, CV-20-1041-PHX-DWL, CV-20-1042-PHX-DLR, CV-20-1044-PHX-DJH, CV-20-1045-PHX-DLR, CV-20-1110-PHX-DLR) (West, John)
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) by CIGNA Healthcare of Arizona Incorporated.(West, John)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Clerk shall dismiss Plaintiff Chandler Therapy Clinic, without further order of the Court on 6/19/2020 unless, before then, Chandler Therapy Clinic obtains counsel and counsel makes an appearance on the record. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/29/2020. (MMO)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 calendar days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/29/2020. (MMO)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/29/2020. (MMO)
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (WLP)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18326397. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01045-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (WLP)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CIGNA Healthcare of Arizona Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent CIGNA Corporation for CIGNA Healthcare of Arizona Incorporated. (West, John) (WLP)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Justice Court, case number CC2020-071100SC. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18326397 filed by CIGNA Healthcare of Arizona Incorporated. (West, John) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(WLP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chandler Therapy Clinic et al v. CIGNA Healthcare of Arizona Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Komarnisky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandler Therapy Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA Healthcare of Arizona Incorporated
Represented By: John C West
Represented By: Jennifer Soo Jung Lee-Cota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?