James River Insurance Company v. Gear et al
Plaintiff: James River Insurance Company
Defendant: Just for Kids PLC and Phillip E Gear
Case Number: 2:2020cv01052
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles
Referring Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall respond to James River's Complaint for Declaratory Relief and Damages on or before August 27, 2020. The Court is not inclined to grant further extension to this deadline absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 7/9/2020. (CLB)
June 26, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint)(Richter, Jasmina)
June 26, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Charles Barrett on behalf of Phillip E Gear, Just for Kids PLC. (Barrett, Kevin)
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge David G Campbell. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-1052-PHX-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by James River Insurance Company: Certificate of Service re: Summons and Complaint et al. upon Just for Kids, P.L.C. on June 8, 2020. (Richter, Jasmina)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by James River Insurance Company. (Richter, Jasmina)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Just for Kids PLC. (GMP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 *Summons Issued as to Phillip E Gear (GMP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. *Modified to correct who summons was issued to on 5/29/2020 (GMP).
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to James River Insurance Company. (GMP)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01052-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 blank consent form)(GMP)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by James River Insurance Company. (Richter, Jasmina) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(GMP)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18328845 filed by James River Insurance Company. (Richter, Jasmina) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(GMP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James River Insurance Company v. Gear et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just for Kids PLC
Represented By: Kevin Charles Barrett
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Bahling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip E Gear
Represented By: Kevin Charles Barrett
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Bahling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Jasmina Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?