Sabra et al v. Maricopa County Community College District et al
Plaintiff: Council on American-Islamic Relations of Arizona and Mohamed Sabra
Defendant: Maricopa County Community College District and Nicholas Damask
Case Number: 2:2020cv01080
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Referring Judge: Deborah M Fine
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Nicholas Damask, Maricopa County Community College District. (Garner, David)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Upon request of counsel for Plaintiff, IT IS ORDERED resetting the 7/28/20 Oral Arguments to 8/06/2020 at 10:00 a.m. (30 minutes allowed). ORDERED by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 7/17/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ESG)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER on the Court's own motion, it is ORDERED resetting the Oral Argument Hearing presently set for 7/20/2020 to 7/28/2020 at 3:30 PM (30 minutes) in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003. ORDERED by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 7/14/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ESG)
July 10, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Council on American-Islamic Relations of Arizona, Mohamed Sabra. (Chami, David)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #26 Motion for Refund of Filing Fee. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 7/08/2020. (ESG)
June 29, 2020 Filing 27 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held on 6/29/2020 before Judge Susan M Brnovich: This is the time set for Evidentiary Hearing on #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Preliminarily, discussion held regarding Defendants' #25 Motion to Dismiss filed on 6/26/2020. After hearing from the parties, the Court rules that the evidentiary hearing will be rescheduled after the motion to dismiss is ruled on. Oral Argument re: #25 Motion to Dismiss set for 7/20/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. Exhibits for the evidentiary hearing are returned to Counsel. APPEARANCES: David Chami, Raeesabbas Mohamed, and Ahmed Soussi for Plaintiffs with Plaintiff Mohamed Sabra. David Garner and Travis Hunt for Defendants with Defendant Nicholas Damask, General Counsel Leslie Cooper, Director of Communications Matt Hanson, and Provost Karla Fisher. (Court Reporter Christine Coaly.) Hearing held 9:00 AM to 9:18 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
June 26, 2020 Filing 26 *MOTION for Refund of Filing Fee by Council on American-Islamic Relations of Arizona, Mohamed Sabra. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chami, David) *Modified to correct motion type and text on 6/29/2020 (REK).
June 26, 2020 Filing 25 *MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Nicholas Damask, Maricopa County Community College District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Affidavit Notice of Certification of Conferral)(Garner, David) *Modified to correct motion type on 6/29/2020 (REK).
June 25, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Council on American-Islamic Relations of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Soussi, Ahmed)
June 22, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed Khaled Soussi on behalf of Council on American-Islamic Relations of Arizona, Mohamed Sabra. (Soussi, Ahmed)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/22/2020. (ESG)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/22/2020. (ESG)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that the application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefore is granted. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/22/2020. (ESG)
June 19, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re: #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Nicholas Damask, Maricopa County Community College District. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Garner, David)
June 17, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David D Garner on behalf of Nicholas Damask, Maricopa County Community College District. (Garner, David)
June 16, 2020 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Council on American-Islamic Relations of Arizona, Mohamed Sabra: Proof of Service re: Issued Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, Request for Preliminary Injunction Hearing, Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction Hearing, Declaration of Imraan Siddiqi, Declaration of Mohamed Sabra, Exhibits A-G, Consent to US Magistrate Judge, Order reassigning case to Judge Susan M. Brnovich, Docket Report as of 6/4/2020, Notice of Errata upon Maricopa County Community College District on 06/16/2020. (Chami, David)
June 9, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Maricopa County Community College District. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 9, 2020 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Council on American-Islamic Relations of Arizona, Mohamed Sabra: Proof of Service re: Issued Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Declaration of Imraan Siddiqi, Declaration of Mohamed Sabra, Request for Preliminary Injunction Hearing, Exhibits A-G, Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge, Docket report as of 6/4/20, Order reassigning case to Judge Susan M. Brnovich, Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Preliminary Injunction, Notice of Errata upon Nicholas Damask on 06/06/2020. (Chami, David)
June 8, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan M. Brnovich: Telephonic Conference re: Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc #3 ) held on 6/8/2020. For reasons set forth on the record, it is ORDERED that Defendant's shall have until 6/19/2020 to respond to the motion for preliminary injunction. Plaintiff shall file a reply by 6/25/2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting an Evidentiary Hearing for 6/29/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 506. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by David Shami, Raeesabbas Mohamed and Ahmed Soussi for Plaintiffs. Telephonic appearance by James Barton for Defendant Nicholas Damask. Leslie Cooper for Defendant Maricopa County Community College District. (Court Reporter Christine Coaly) Hearing held 10:01 AM to 10:11 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ESG)
June 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James Evans Barton, II on behalf of Nicholas Damask. (Barton, James)
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Submitted by Council on American-Islamic Relations of Arizona, Mohamed Sabra. (Chami, David)
June 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #4 Summons Submitted filed by Council on American-Islamic Relations of Arizona, Mohamed Sabra. Party name on summons does not match complaint. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Nicholas Damask. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: Setting a Telephonic Conference for 6/8/2020 at 10:00 AM (15 minutes allowed) before Judge Susan M Brnovich to discuss scheduling the preliminary injunction hearing. The parties will receive dial-in instructions for connecting to the teleconference via electronic mail prior to the hearing. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ESG)
June 5, 2020 Civil Case Opening Fee Received: $ 400.00 receipt number 0970-18352914. (Chami, David)
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Errata re: #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Memorandum by Plaintiffs Council on American-Islamic Relations of Arizona, Mohamed Sabra.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. That this case be reassigned, by lot, to another Judge in the District of Arizona. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-20-1080-PHX-SMB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 6/4/20. (MAP)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Oral Argument Requested #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Council on American-Islamic Relations of Arizona, Mohamed Sabra. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mohamed Sabra, #2 Exhibit Ex A - Sabra Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex B - Sabra Declaration, #4 Exhibit Ex C - Sabra Declaration, #5 Exhibit Ex D - Sabra Declaration, #6 Exhibit Ex E - Sabra Declaration, #7 Exhibit Ex F - Sabra Declaration, #8 Exhibit Ex G - Sabra Declaration, #9 Affidavit Declaration of Imraan Siddiqi)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-1080-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (MYE)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Mohamed Sabra, and Council on American-Islamic Relations of Arizona. (Chami, David) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MYE)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Mohamed Sabra, and Council on American-Islamic Relations of Arizona. (Chami, David) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Imraan Siddiqi, #2 Declaration of Mohamed Sabra, #3 Request for Preliminary Injunction Hearing)(MYE)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mohamed Sabra. (Chami, David) (MYE)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mohamed Sabra, and Council on American-Islamic Relations of Arizona. (Chami, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabra et al v. Maricopa County Community College District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Council on American-Islamic Relations of Arizona
Represented By: David Ali Chami
Represented By: Raeesabbas Mohamed
Represented By: Ahmed Khaled Soussi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Sabra
Represented By: David Ali Chami
Represented By: Raeesabbas Mohamed
Represented By: Ahmed Khaled Soussi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Community College District
Represented By: David D Garner
Represented By: Travis Charles Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Damask
Represented By: David D Garner
Represented By: Travis Charles Hunt
Represented By: Jacqueline Mendez Soto
Represented By: James Evans Barton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?