Von Laven et al v. First Horizon Finance Company et al
Plaintiff: John Von Laven and Linda Von Laven
Defendant: First Horizon Finance Company and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2020cv01095
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Stay Discovery and Vacate Scheduling Conference Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/14/2020. (MMO)
July 13, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery, Joint MOTION to Vacate Scheduling Conference Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss by First Horizon Finance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edwards, Erin)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Filed by First Horizon Finance Company. The deadline for Plaintiffs John Von Laven and Linda Von Laven to file their Response to Defendant First Horizon Bank's #10 Motion to Dismiss is extended through and including 8/9/2020. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/1/2020. (MMO)
June 30, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Certificate of Service and Proposed Order by John Von Laven, Linda Von Laven. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keyt, Norman)
June 24, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by First Horizon Finance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Balser, Justin)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. First Horizon Finance Company answer due 6/24/2020 Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/11/2020. (MMO)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by First Horizon Finance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balser, Justin)
June 9, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Erin E Edwards on behalf of Defendant First Horizon Finance Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE re: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by First Horizon Finance Company . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Balser, Justin)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2020 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 calendar days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/4/2020. (MMO)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/4/2020. (MMO)
June 3, 2020 ***STATE COURT record received on 6/03/2020***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by John Von Laven, Linda Von Laven: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon First Horizon Finance Company via CT Corporation on 5/04/2020.***Declaration filed in State Court on 5/05/2020, docketed in U.S. District Court on 6/03/2020 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
June 3, 2020 ***STATE COURT record received on 6/03/2020***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by John Von Laven, Linda Von Laven: Amended Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Certificate Regarding Compulsory Arbitration upon First Horizon Finance Company on 4/16/2020.***Filed in State Court on 4/22/2020, docketed in U.S. District Court on 6/03/2020 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by First Horizon Finance Company, #1 Notice of Removal filed by First Horizon Finance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18344078. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L. Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01095-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Horizon Finance Company. (submitted by Justin Balser) (REK)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-004746. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18344078 filed by First Horizon Finance Company. (submitted by Justin Balser) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplemental Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Von Laven et al v. First Horizon Finance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Horizon Finance Company
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Represented By: Erin E Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Von Laven
Represented By: Christopher Michael Bistany
Represented By: Norman Colin Keyt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Von Laven
Represented By: Christopher Michael Bistany
Represented By: Norman Colin Keyt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?