Henrietta Mine LLC v. A.M. King Industries Incorporated
Plaintiff: Henrietta Mine LLC
Defendant: A.M. King Industries Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2020cv01106
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Henrietta Mine LLC. (Northup, Doug)
July 28, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #14 Notice of Service of Discovery filed by A.M. King Industries Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA)
July 27, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by A.M. King Industries Incorporated. (Stone, Erik)
July 24, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Henrietta Mine LLC. (Northup, Doug)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 10/30/2020. Dispositive motions due by 12/18/2020. IT IS ORDERED vacating the 7/24/2020 Rule 16 Case Management Conference. On 1/08/2021 at 9:00 a.m. (15 minutes allowed), the court will conduct a telephonic trial setting conference. Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call by arranging for the presence of all other attorneys and self-represented parties, and by calling chambers at the scheduled time. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 7/14/2020. (ESG)
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Henrietta Mine LLC. (Gilmore, Brett)
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Henrietta Mine LLC. (Northup, Doug)
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by A.M. King Industries Incorporated. (Stone, Erik)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.M. King Industries Incorporated. (Stone, Erik)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by A.M. King Industries Incorporated.(Stone, Erik)
June 9, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for David ER Woolley on behalf of Defendant A.M. King Industries Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 7/24/2020 at 8:45 a.m. (15 minutes allowed). Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call by arranging for the presence of all other attorneys and self-represented parties, and by calling chambers at the scheduled time. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/05/2020. (ESG)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/05/2020. (ESG)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/05/2020. (ESG)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to A.M. King Industries Incorporated, Henrietta Mine LLC. (REK)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18349541. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01106-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
June 4, 2020 ***STATE COURT record received on 6/04/2020***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Henrietta Mine LLC: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver signed by defense counsel for A.M. King Industries Incorporated on 5/18/2020.***Acceptance of Service filed in State Court on unknown date, docketed in U.S. District Court on 6/04/2020 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-005614. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18349541 filed by A.M. King Industries Incorporated. (submitted by Erik Stone) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henrietta Mine LLC v. A.M. King Industries Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.M. King Industries Incorporated
Represented By: Erik John Stone
Represented By: David E.R. Woolley
Represented By: David ER Woolley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henrietta Mine LLC
Represented By: Doug C Northup
Represented By: Brett Christopher Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?