Schaefer v. Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Adam Schaefer
Defendant: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01108
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Adam Schaefer: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, CV Cover Sheet, Order, Notice of Availability of Magistrate upon Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company on 06/09/2020. (Surrano, Charles)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on September 4, 2020. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/5/2020. (JAMA)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/5/2020. (JAMA)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18350410. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J. Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01108-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Adam Schaefer. (submitted by Charles Surrano) (REK)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18350410 filed by Adam Schaefer. (submitted by Charles Surrano) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schaefer v. Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Schaefer
Represented By: John Neal Wilborn
Represented By: Charles J Surrano, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?