Stevens et al v. Standard Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Craig H Stevens and Wendy A Stevens
Defendant: Unknown Parties, Unknown Althoff, Standard Insurance Company and Keith Althoff
Case Number: 2:2020cv01119
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY re: #6 Response to Notice of Removal by Defendant Standard Insurance Company. (Andrews, Ann-Martha)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Defendant shall file a Reply by 7/6/20. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/26/20. (DXD)
June 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #6 Response. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE re: #6 Response to Notice of Removal by Defendant Standard Insurance Company. (Andrews, Ann-Martha)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Notice of Removal by Plaintiff Craig H Stevens. (Froderman, Troy)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Standard Insurance Company.(Andrews, Ann-Martha)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court orders Plaintiffs file a response addressing the relevance of Mr. Althoff's citizenship in determining jurisdiction. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a response no later than June 22, 2020. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/9/20. (MAW)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18354039. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01119-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
June 5, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORD received on 6/05/2020***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Craig H Stevens, Wendy A Stevens: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Demand for Jury Trial, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Standard Insurance Company on 5/08/2020.***Affidavit of Service filed in State Court on 5/13/2020, docketed in U.S. District Court on 6/05/2020 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Standard Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Meiji Yasuda Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent StanCorp Financial Group Incorporated for Standard Insurance Company. (submitted by Ann-Martha Andrews) (REK)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-005571. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18354039 filed by Standard Insurance Company. (submitted by Ann-Martha Andrews) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens et al v. Standard Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig H Stevens
Represented By: Troy Blinn Froderman
Represented By: John Frederick Barwell
Represented By: Scott Corey Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy A Stevens
Represented By: Troy Blinn Froderman
Represented By: John Frederick Barwell
Represented By: Scott Corey Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Althoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Ann-Martha Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Althoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?