Howard v. Ethicon Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Jamie Michelle Howard
Defendant: Ethicon Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01137
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 73 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #72 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Ethicon Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Johnston, Bradley)
July 24, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ethicon Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Bradley)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying #34 the Motion to Exclude. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 7/14/2020. (RMW)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER (text only): IT IS ORDERED allowing the parties until 8/10/2020 to file a joint report as to whether additional discovery is needed in light of any medical treatment Plaintiff received after her deposition. There shall be no extensions of this deadline. Should the parties not, by this deadline, provide with particularity compelling reasons to extend discovery, the Court will follow the recommendation of Judge Joseph Goodwin (Doc. #41 at 1) to not allow additional discovery. Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 7/10/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
July 10, 2020 Filing 69 *REPORT of Joint Report Regarding Additional Discovery re: 68 by Defendants Ethicon Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson. (Johnston, Bradley) *Modified on 7/13/2020 to remove previously terminated party as a filer (REK).
July 6, 2020 Remark: Out of state attorney Christine V Clarke removed as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER (text only): At the 6/24/2020 Status Conference, the parties informed the Court that the need for further discovery would depend on whether Plaintiff Jamie Howard has received additional medical treatment since her deposition. Plaintiff subsequently filed a report concerning her medical status and treatment (Doc. #66 ). IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall, by 7/10/2020, file a joint report stating the parties' position(s) as to whether additional discovery is needed in light of Plaintiff's recent update. Any request for additional discovery shall indicate with particularity what discovery is necessary and include a proposed timeline. Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 7/6/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
July 2, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #66 Report - Other filed by Jamie Michelle Howard. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by attorney Christopher Gomez but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Lee Balefsky. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
July 2, 2020 Filing 66 REPORT of J. Howard Medical update pursuant to the June 24, 2020 Orderto by Plaintiff Jamie Michelle Howard. (Balefsky, Lee)
June 24, 2020 Filing 65 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Michael T. Liburdi: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/24/2020. IT IS ORDERED granting the Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Uncontested Claims (Doc. #64 ), and dismissing Counts II, IV, VI, VII, VIII, IX, X, XI, XII, XIII, XIV and XV of Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice, each side to bear its own fees and costs with respect thereto. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, (Doc. #32 ), is deemed withdrawn. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting Defendants leave to file a new summary judgment motion within thirty (30) days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Gomez continue to attempt to locate Plaintiff and inquire as to her medical treatment over the last year, and to file a report with the Court by no later than noon on Friday, 7/3/2020. See the attached pdf for complete details. (Court Reporter Barbara Stockford) Hearing held 1:58 PM to 2:38 PM.(RMW)
June 23, 2020 Filing 64 STIPULATION of Dismissal of 1) Uncontested Claims and 2) Notice of Remaining Claims by Ethicon Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Bradley)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER setting a Telephonic Status Conference for Wednesday, 6/24/2020 at 02:00 PM. The parties will receive call-in instructions via email to participate in the hearing. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 6/19/2020. (RMW)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Ethicon, LLC (Doc. #59 ) and dismissing Defendant Ethicon LLC, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Because other defendants remain, the Clerk of the Court shall not close this case. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 6/19/2020. (RMW)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson (Doc. #57 ). Attorneys Benjamin M. Watson, Christy D. Jones, David B. Thomas, Susan M. Robinson, Amy Pepke, and William M. Gage and their respective law firms are relieved of any further representation of Defendants Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson in this case. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 6/19/2020. (RMW)
June 17, 2020 Filing 60 STATUS REPORT by Ethicon Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit)(Johnston, Bradley)
June 17, 2020 Filing 59 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Ethicon, LLC by Ethicon Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Bradley)
June 12, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Christopher A Gomez, Lee B Balefsky on behalf of Plaintiff Jamie Michelle Howard. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER that the parties may file a joint status report within 7 days of the date of this Order. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 6/11/2020. (RMW)
June 10, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ethicon Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Bradley)
June 10, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley James Johnston on behalf of Ethicon Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson. (Johnston, Bradley)
June 9, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE Re Transfer of 2:14-cv-07903 from the Southern District of West Virginia to the District of Arizona. New Case Number: CV-20-01137-PHX-MTL. (MAP)
June 9, 2020 Filing 54 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:14-cv-07903 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
June 1, 2020 Filing 53 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (8562) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Richard Wasserman, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (8563) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Richard Wasserman, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (8652) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Richard Wasserman)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 52 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) - Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (7346) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) Defs Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8529) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8623) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 51 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2035) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2037) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2153) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2236) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2530) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8501) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8614) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp Regarding Christina Pramudji)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 50 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2205) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 3 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2206) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2297) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2825) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2826) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2942) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3053) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (8496) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8609) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp Regarding Steven Maclean)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 49 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2130) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Brian Flynn, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2131) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Brian Flynn, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2269) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Brian Flynn, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2280) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Brian Flynn, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2854) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Brian Flynn, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2855) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Brian Flynn, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2913) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Brian Flynn, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3048) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Brian Flynn, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8483) - Amended Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Brian Flynn, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8627) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp Regarding Brian Flynn)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 48 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (5482) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (8541) Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8599) - Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 47 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2049) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2241) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce RosenzweigMDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 10 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 11 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 12 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 13 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 14 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 46 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2075) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2078) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2172) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2214) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2759) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8531) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8596) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp of Peggy Pence)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 45 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2029) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2031) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2169) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2212) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2832) Defs Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis and Notice of Adoption, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2833) Defs Mem in Support of Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis and Notice of Adoption, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2904) Pls Resp to Defs Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis and Notice of Adoption, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8556) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8590) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 44 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2188) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2200) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3630) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 5 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 6 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (3855) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8519) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8588) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 43 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1978) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 10 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 11 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 12 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 13 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 14 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 15 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 16 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 17 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 18 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 19 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 20 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 21 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (1982) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 42 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (240) Master Answer of Ethicon LLC to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 06/05/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 06/04/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/22/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #15 MOTION by Jamie Michelle Howard to Substitute Lee Balefsky and Christine Clarke of Kline & Specter, P.C. as Counsel in lieu of Howard L. Nations and The Nations Law Firm. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/21/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to #35 Response In Opposition. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM by Jamie Michelle Howard in opposition to #34 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Case Specific Opinions of Scott Bailey, M.D. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE by Jamie Michelle Howard in opposition to #34 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Case Specific Opinions of Scott Bailey, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit E)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM by Jamie Michelle Howard in opposition to #32 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE by Jamie Michelle Howard in opposition to #32 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Case Specific Opinions of Scott Bailey, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Gage, William) Modified on 8/15/2019 (slr). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson in support of #32 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 31 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Scott Bailey, M.D. on 7/10/2019 at 3:00 p.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants' Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Scott Bailey, M.D. on 7/10/19 at 3:00 p.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jamie Michelle Howard for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Issuance of Second Amended Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action to Dr. Daniel Rowland, by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Watson, Benjamin) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 26 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Daniel Rowland on 06/20/2019 at 1:30 PM (Watson, Benjamin) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Issuance of Amended Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action to Dr. Daniel Rowland by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Watson, Benjamin) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Daniel Rowland on 05/13/2019 at 1:30 PM (Watson, Benjamin) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Watson, Benjamin) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Daniel Rowland on 05/13/2019 at TBD (Watson, Benjamin) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Jamie Howard on May 22, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. (Pepke, Amy) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jamie Michelle Howard for Responses for Interrogatories, Request for Admission, Request for Production of Documents. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for Ethicon Inc's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Requests for Production. (Pepke, Amy) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Amy Pepke on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Pepke, Amy) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Benjamin M. Watson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Watson, Benjamin) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Jamie Michelle Howard to Substitute Lee Balefsky and Christine Clarke of Kline & Specter, P.C. as Counsel in lieu of Howard L. Nations and The Nations Law Firm (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lee B. Balefsky on behalf of Jamie Michelle Howard. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRETRIAL ORDER # 328 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 11 Cases) The cases on Exhibit A are: 1. removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2. placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1. The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; 2. To the extent other defendants, in addition to Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3. The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B (hereinafter referred to as "Wave 11 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order.; and 4. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Ethicon Wave 11 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES.. The following deadlines shall apply in all Ethicon Wave 11 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 02/15/2019; Defendant Fact Sheets due 02/22/2019; Deadline for written discovery requests due 03/25/2019; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 05/24/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 06/24/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 07/01/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 08/01/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 08/14/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 08/28/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 09/04/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 08/14/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 08/29/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 09/05/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3. Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 6/27/2019, and any response is due by 7/11/2019. Any reply is due by 7/18/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 7/8/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/4/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 11 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL ORDER # 298 FIRST AMENDED ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITION OF NON-REVISION GYNECARE TVT PRODUCTS CASES This amended order revises certain future deadlines and addresses filing instructions regarding the Ethicon Election Form; the Order has been amended at paragraphs 2-5, paragraph 8(B)-(H), and Exhibit B; however, the remainder of this Order is substantively identical to PTO No. 293; if a plaintiff has already filed her Ethicon Election Form pursuant to the deadlines imposed by PTO No. 293, she is not required to re-file an Election Form; if an Election Form has not been filed it must be filed in each individual member case no later than 7/10/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/15/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on the Second Amended Exhibit A) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive") (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL ORDER # 293 ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITION OF NON-REVISION GYNECARE TVT PRODUCTS CASES The Motion filed at ECF No. 5313 in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Order Regarding Disposition of Non-Revision Gynecare TVT Products Cases is GRANTED; each Non-Revised Plaintiff identified on the Second Amended Exhibit "A", together with any of her derivative plaintiffs with an existing MDL lawsuit, shall file an election form (Exhibit B to this Order) in each individual case no later than 6/10/2018; the deadlines for discovery and trial preparation procedures are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/11/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on the Second Amended Exhibit A) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 8/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER Having been advised by counsel that in the cases listed on the attached Exhibit A, the plaintiffs and Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, and where named, Ethicon, LLC have agreed to a mutual stay of activity. The Court finds it unnecessary to conduct further proceedings or to keep these cases on the active docket and ORDERS as follows: 1) all discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the Court, 2) the Clerk is directed to retire each of the cases listed on the attached Exhibit A from the active docket, 3) any case listed on Exhibit A that has not been dismissed or does not have a motion to reinstate to the active docket filed with the court for consideration by 3/31/2018 will be reinstated to the active docket by order of the court with a shortened Docket Control Order. This Order is linked to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 5045. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/16/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
June 21, 2017 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Jamie Michelle Howard. (Nations, Howard) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
September 2, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
January 7, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
March 28, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
February 19, 2014 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 101 (SHOW CAUSE ORDER RE: MOTION TO APPOINT LIEN RESOLUTION ADMINISTRATOR) entered on 02/18/2014 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (maw) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]
February 5, 2014 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2981294. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Service Under Delayed Filing Agreement) (tlg) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/9/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Ethicon Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Incorporated
Represented By: Amy Pepke
Represented By: Amy M. Pepke
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Represented By: Christy D Jones
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: David B Thomas
Represented By: Benjamin M Watson
Represented By: Bradley James Johnston
Represented By: Levi Trent Claridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Amy Pepke
Represented By: Amy M. Pepke
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Represented By: Christy D Jones
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: David B Thomas
Represented By: Benjamin M Watson
Represented By: Bradley James Johnston
Represented By: Levi Trent Claridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon LLC
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: David B Thomas
Represented By: Benjamin M Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Michelle Howard
Represented By: Howard L Nations
Represented By: Christine V Clarke
Represented By: Lee B Balefsky
Represented By: Christopher A Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?