Kwintkiewicz v. Whats Up LLC
Plaintiff: Malgorzata Kwintkiewicz
Defendant: Whats Up LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01173
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to #13 Order, this matter is hereby dismissed without prejudice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LAD)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED denying Richard Paul Liebowitz's Motion to Extend Time to File Pro Hac Vice Motion (Doc. #11 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice within 30 days from the date of this Order unless a Notice of Appearance for the Plaintiff is filed by an attorney admitted to practice before this Court or who has qualified for pro hac vice admission or Plaintiff files an avowal that she is prepared to prosecute this case pro se. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this action, without further notice, on August 6, 2020. (See document for further details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/7/2020. (LAD)
July 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pro Hac Vice Motion filed by Malgorzata Kwintkiewicz. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Document not in compliance with LRCiv LRCiv 7.1(a)(1) - Forms of Papers. The name, address, email address, State Bar Attorney number, telephone number, and optionally the fax number, of the attorney appearing for the party in the action - must be typewritten or printed in the space to the left of the center of the page and beginning at line one on the first page. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMP)
July 2, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pro Hac Vice Motion by Malgorzata Kwintkiewicz. (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER/NOTICE directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on September 11, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/15/2020. (REK)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Whats Up LLC. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Malgorzata Kwintkiewicz. (MCO)
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(MCO)
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Malgorzata Kwintkiewicz. (MCO)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Malgorzata Kwintkiewicz. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Malgorzata Kwintkiewicz. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18378172. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-1173-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Malgorzata Kwintkiewicz. (Liebowitz, Richard) (MCO)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18378172 filed by Malgorzata Kwintkiewicz. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kwintkiewicz v. Whats Up LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malgorzata Kwintkiewicz
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whats Up LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?