Currence v. USA
Petitioner: Steven Robert Currence, Steven R Currence and Steven Currence
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 2:2020cv01177
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Eileen S Willett (PS)
Referring Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Steven Robert Currence. (33 Pages) (REK)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Movant's "Motion for Time Reduction by an Inmate in Federal Custody, (28 U.S.C. 2255)" (Doc. #1 in CV 20-01177-PHX-DGC(ESW)) is denied with leave to amend. Movant has 30 days from the date of filing of this Order to file an amended motion in compliance with this Order. If Movant fails to file an amended motion within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, terminate Document 65 in CR 14-00755-PHX-DGC and enter a judgment of dismissal of the civil action opened in connection with this 2255 action (CV 20-01177-PHX-DGC (ESW)), without prejudice, and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 6/26/2020. (REK)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (HLA)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 *MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) - (Davis or Residual Clause) re: Criminal Case No CR-14-755-PHX-DGC-1 filed by Steven Robert Currence. (33 pages)***SCANNED IMAGE IS BEST EFFORT*** (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(HLA) *Modified to regenerate NEF on 6/16/2020 (SCH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Currence v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Robert Currence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven R Currence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Currence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Jillian Besancon
Represented By: Krissa Marie Lanham
Represented By: Christine Ducat Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?