Frontier Enterprises Incorporated et al v. Western Agricultural Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Cave Creek General Store LLC and Frontier Enterprises Incorporated
Defendant: Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company and Western Agricultural Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01184
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Frontier Enterprises Incorporated. (Dessaules, Jonathan)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Cave Creek General Store LLC, Frontier Enterprises Incorporated. (KFZ)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Telephone Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2020 at 09:00 AM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/22/2020. (WLP)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Answer to First Amended Complaint by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Western Agricultural Insurance Company.(Reiman, Clarissa)
June 15, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Certificate of Service re: Summons, First Amended Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Demand for Jury Trial, Acceptance Fee Check upon Western Agricultural Insurance Company and upon Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company, both C/O Arizona Department of Insurance on 5/15/20 (originals filed in Maricopa County Superior 5/18/20).(BAC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18381577. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01184-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Farm Bureau Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Western Agricultural Insurance Company. (Snell, Josh) (BAC) Modified on 7/6/2020 to correct filer (KFZ).
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-005318. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18381577 filed by Frontier Enterprises Incorporated, Cave Creek General Store LLC. (Snell, Josh) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #4 Exhibit B - Complaint, #5 Exhibit C - First Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service on Western Agricultural, #7 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Service on Farm Bureau)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frontier Enterprises Incorporated et al v. Western Agricultural Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cave Creek General Store LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Adam Dessaules
Represented By: Michael Reddick Perry
Represented By: Douglas M Imperi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frontier Enterprises Incorporated
Represented By: Jonathan Adam Dessaules
Represented By: Michael Reddick Perry
Represented By: Douglas M Imperi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Josh Michael Snell
Represented By: Clarissa Braza Reiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Agricultural Insurance Company
Represented By: Josh Michael Snell
Represented By: Clarissa Braza Reiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?