Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Aggers et al
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Unknown Aggers, Patrick Iacono, Tara Iacono, Morgan Aggers, Harry Aggers and Robyn Aggers
Case Number: 2:2020cv01190
Filed: June 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Stein, Amy)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/17/2020. (MMO)
June 17, 2020 Filing 6 *AMENDED COMPLAINT (Redacted) Corrected against All Defendants filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stein, Amy) *Modified to include "redacted" on 6/18/2020 (REK).
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Plaintiff shall submit a corrected version of the Complaint and Corporate Disclosure Statement, redacting the minor's name, in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a)(3), no later than 6/20/2020. The Clerk of the Court is directed to seal the Plaintiff's Complaint and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Docs. 1, 4). Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/16/2020. (MMO)
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Stein, Amy) *Modified to Seal Pursuant to Doc. #5 on 6/17/2020 (MAP).
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Safeco Insurance Company of America. (BAC)
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18385714. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01190-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
June 16, 2020 Filing 1 *COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18385714 filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Stein, Amy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC) *Modified to Seal Pursuant to Doc. #5 on 6/17/2020 (MAP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Aggers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Aggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Iacono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Iacono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Aggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Aggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn Aggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Amy Lynn Stein
Represented By: Amy Michelle Samberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?